Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2375678 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2375678



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 248
02.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
02.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
14.10.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 31
09.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.07.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
09.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 8
13.05.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.01.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.01.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.03.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
25.01.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.10.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.04.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
03.04.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.04.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
03.04.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.10.2011 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
14.09.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.09.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.01.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.01.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 4
13.12.2010 European search report Search / examination 3
09.11.2010 Amendments not yet acceptable Search / examination 1
02.11.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Description Search / examination 21
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 7
30.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
09.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37