Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008070189 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98530407 | 14.11.2007 | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | US53974103 | 22.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7677890 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2010 | B2 | US2006121413 | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2266489 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | EP03785428 | 22.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2266488 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | EP03785428 | 22.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2266487 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2011 | A3 | EP2266487 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | EP03785428 | 22.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578292 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008243133B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2010 | B8 | AU2008243133B | 22.07.2010 | B2 | AU2008243133 | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003294536 | 22.12.2003 | AU2008243133 | 06.11.2008 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003294536B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2009 | B2 | AU2003294536 | 14.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2266486 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | EP03785428 | 22.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0317566 | 13.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2510722 | 08.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2510722 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA008435 | 29.06.2007 | B1 | EA200501006 | 24.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05006704 | 17.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20053521L | 18.07.2005 | L | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ540807 | 22.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0301999 | 22.12.2003 | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004056279 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2004 | A3 | WO2004056279 | 08.07.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2414908 | 20.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100579483C | 13.01.2010 | C | CN1728973 | 01.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101438978 | 27.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101647727 | 17.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200505482 | 26.04.2006 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2414908 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Earlier application | EP1578292 |