EP2266486 - Dental handpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TTi Turner Technology Instruments Inc. 1620 Scott Street Suite 20 Ottawa, ON K1Y 4S7 / CA | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Derek 243 Range Road Ottawa Ontario K1N 8J7 / CA | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10184783.8 | 22.12.2003 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | CA20022414908 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: CA 2414908 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2266486 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/05, A61C1/18, A61C1/12, A61C1/14, A61B17/16 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A61C1/05 (EP,US);
A61C1/052 (EP,US);
A61C1/057 (EP,US);
A61C1/12 (EP,US);
A61C1/142 (EP,US);
A61C1/18 (EP,US);
A61C1/181 (EP,US);
A61C1/188 (EP,US);
B23B31/005 (EP,US);
A61B17/1628 (EP,US);
A61B17/1646 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00553 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | Dentalmedizinisches Handstück | [2010/52] | English: | Dental handpiece | [2010/52] | French: | Pièce à main dentaire | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03785428.8 / EP1578292 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030785428) is 14.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US1984663 | US3906635 | US4370132 | US4470813 | US4595363 | US4820154 | US5057015 | US5275558 | US5507642 | US5549474 | US5782634 | US6033220 | US6065966 | US6120291 | US2001002975 | US6319003 |