EP2264440 - Apparatus for detection of biological organisms using Raman scattering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sword Diagnostics, Inc. 3440 South Dearborn Street, Suite 260 Chicago IL 60616 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Sword Diagnostics, Inc. 6502 South Archer Road Summit-Argo IL 60501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegel, Neal A. 625 North Gorham Road Morris, IL 60450 / US | 02 /
Fischell, David R. 71 Riverlawn Drive Fair Haven, NJ 07704 / US | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184978.4 | 16.10.2006 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | US20050727328P | 17.10.2005 Original published format: US 727328 P | US20060836936P | 11.08.2006 Original published format: US 836936 P | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264440 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264440 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/65, G01N33/543 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Nachweis biologischer Organismen mittels Raman-streuung | [2010/51] | English: | Apparatus for detection of biological organisms using Raman scattering | [2010/51] | French: | Appareil de détection d'organismes biologiques en utilisant la diffusion Raman | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06816934.1 / EP1946083 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060816934) is 16.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003059820 (VO-DINH TUAN [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,12,14 * claims 1-37 * * examples 1,5 * * figure 21 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0030] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098] *; | [XI] - XU SHUPING ET AL, "Surface-enhanced Raman scattering studies on immunoassay", J BIOMED OPT; JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS MAY/JUNE 2005, (200505), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 1 - 12, XP002423176 [X] 1-6,8-10,12,14 * figures 1,7 * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 2 * [I] 7,11,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1915487 | [X] - GROW ANN E ET AL, "New biochip technology for label-free detection of pathogens and their toxins.", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS MAY 2003, (200305), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0167-7012, pages 221 - 233, XP002423177 [X] 1-3,5,6,8,12,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 223, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 226, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7012(03)00026-5 | Examination | WO0043754 | by applicant | US20050727328 | US20060836936 |