EP2311455 - Compounds for nonsense suppression, and methods for their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, NL, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PTC Therapeutics, Inc. 100 Corporate Court South Plainfield, NJ 07080 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almstead, Neil 179 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
Chen, Guangming 1402 Stech Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
Karp, Gary Mitchell 37 Cartwright Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | 04 /
Welch, Ellen 33 Hollow Brook Road Califon, NJ 07830 / US | 05 /
Wilde, Richard Gerald 13 Cascades Terrace Sommerville, NJ 08876 / US | 06 /
Campbell, Jeffrey Allen 328 Adams Street Apt. 103 Bethlehem, PA 18015 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
Almstead, Neil 179 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Guangming 1402 Stech Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
03 /
Karp, Gary Mitchell 37 Cartwright Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | |||
04 /
Welch, Ellen 33 Hollow Brook Road Califon, NJ 07830 / US | |||
05 /
Wilde, Richard Gerald 13 Cascades Terrace Sommerville, NJ 08876 / US | |||
06 /
Campbell, Jeffrey Allen 328 Adams Street Apt. 103 Bethlehem, PA 18015 / US | |||
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Almstead, Neil 179 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Guangming 1402 Stech Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
03 /
Karp, Gary Mitchell 37 Cartwright Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | |||
04 /
Welch, Ellen 33 Hollow Brook Road Califon, NJ 07830 / US | |||
05 /
Wilde, Richard Gerald 13 Cascades Terrace Sommerville, NJ 08876 / US | |||
06 /
Campbell, Jeffrey Allen 31 Bell Avenue Glen Gardner, NJ 08826 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10185130.1 | 13.10.2005 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | US20040617653P | 13.10.2004 Original published format: US 617653 P | US20040617670P | 13.10.2004 Original published format: US 617670 P | US20040617633P | 13.10.2004 Original published format: US 617633 P | US20040617634P | 13.10.2004 Original published format: US 617634 P | US20040617655P | 13.10.2004 Original published format: US 617655 P | US20040624170P | 03.11.2004 Original published format: US 624170 P | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311455 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2311455 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4245, A61K31/433, A61P35/00, C07D417/10, C07D277/30 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/4155 (KR);
A61K31/53 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D251/24 (EP,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D271/10 (EP,US);
C07D271/107 (EP,US);
C07D277/30 (EP,US);
C07D285/12 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungen zur Nonsense-Unterdrückung und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [2011/16] | English: | Compounds for nonsense suppression, and methods for their use | [2011/16] | French: | Composes de suppression de non-sens et procedes de leur utilisation | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05815159.8 / EP1815206 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050815159) is 27.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2005 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | IE | 13.10.2015 | LU | 13.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3947263 (BROUWER WALTER G, et al) [X] 1 * column 6; compounds G,O *; | [X]US3964896 (BROUWER WALTER G, et al) [X] 1 * column 9 - column 10; examples 29-31 *; | [X]US4210762 (HOWE ROBERT K [US]) [X] 1 * examples 5,6,8 *; | [X]DE3819037 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * example 43; claim - *; | [X]EP0838453 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 10 - line 27; examples 18,19,22,23; claims 1,8-10 *; | [X]EP0889032 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 3, line 13 - line 30; examples 1,62,63; claims 1,14-19 *; | [X]WO02068417 (NPS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 46; examples 10,B147,B265; claims 1,7,8,10,14 *; | [X]WO2004072050 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 13-16; claim - *; | [X] - MACDONALD G J ET AL, "Design and Synthesis of trans-3(2-(4-((3-(3-(5-Methyl-1,2,4-oxadiozol yl))-phenyl)carboxamido)cyclohexyl)ethyl)-7-methylsulfonyl-2,3,4,5-te trahydro1H-3-benzazepine (SB-414796): A Potent and Selective Dopamine D.sub.3 Receptor Antagonist", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (20031106), vol. 46, no. 23, doi:10.1021/JM030817D, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4952 - 4964, XP002994764 [X] 1 * Schemes 1 and 2 *; page 4954, column r, line 25, paragraph 2 - line 28; compounds 31,33,56 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm030817d | by applicant | US4892538 | WO9325673 | US5283187 | US5681746 | US2003023185 | US6800604 | US6800731 | - ZAMBETTI, G.P.; LEVINE, A., FASEB, (1993), vol. 7, pages 855 - 865 | - HOLLSTEIN, M. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 3551 - 55 | - KOSHLAND, D., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, page 1953 | - SLEAT, EUR. J. PED. NEUROL., (2001), vol. 5, no. A, pages 57 - 62 | - BEDWELL, NAT. MED., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1280 - 1284 | - HOWARD, NAT. MED., (1996), vol. 2, pages 467 - 469 | - BARTON-DAVIS, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, pages 375 - 381 | - KUBO ET AL., TET. LETT., (1986), vol. 27, page 4277 | - MOSS ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, pages 786 - 790 | - KAMIKAWA ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1988), page 195 | - MOSS ET AL., J. MED. CHERN., (1988), vol. 31, pages 786 - 790 | - MASUDA ET AL., TOKAI J EXP CLIN MED., (2000), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 69 - 77 | - OH ET AL., MOL CELLS, (2000), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 275 - 80 | - LI ET AL., LAB INVEST, (2000), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 493 - 9 | - YANG ET AL., ZHONGHUA ZHONG LIU ZA ZHI, (1999), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 114 - 8 | - FINKELSTEIN ET AL., MOL DIAGN., (1998), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 37 - 41 | - KAJIYAMA ET AL., DIS ESOPHAGUS., (1998), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 279 - 83 | - KAWAMURA ET AL., LEUK RES., (1999), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 115 - 26 | - RADIG ET AL., HUM PATHOL., (1998), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 1310 - 6 | - SCHUYER ET AL., INT J CANCER, (1998), vol. 76, no. 3, pages 299 - 303 | - WANG-GOHRKE ET AL., ONCOL REP., (1998), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 65 - 8 | - FULOP ET AL., J REPROD MED., (1998), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 119 - 27 | - NINOMIYA ET AL., J DERMATOL SCI., (1997), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 173 - 8 | - HSIEH ET AL., CANCER LETT., (1996), vol. 100, no. 1-2, pages 107 - 13 | - RALL ET AL., PANCREAS, (1996), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 10 - 7 | - FUKUTOMI ET AL., NIPPON RINSHO, (1995), vol. 53, no. 11, pages 2764 - 8 | - FREBOURG ET AL., AM J HUM GENET., (1995), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 608 - 15 | - DOVE ET AL., CANCER SURV., (1995), vol. 25, pages 335 - 55 | - ADAMSON ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL., (1995), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 61 - 6 | - GRAYSON ET AL., AM J PEDIATR HEMATOL ONCOL., (1994), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 341 - 7 | - LEPELLEY ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (1994), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 1342 - 9 | - MCINTYRE ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (1994), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 925 - 30 | - HORIO ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1994), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 1231 - 5 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., JPN J CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 1293 - 8 | - DAVIDOFF ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1992), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 127 - 33 | - ISHIOKA ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1991), vol. 177, no. 3, pages 901 - 6 | - Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, (2001), pages 491 - 762 | - LIE; MACDONALD, DEVELOPMENT, (1999), vol. 126, no. 22, pages 4989 - 4996 | - LIE; MACDONALD, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (2000), vol. 270, no. 2, pages 473 - 481 | - YANG ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1993), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 1253 - 1261 | - HOWARD ET AL., NAT. MED., (1996), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 467 - 469 | - TONKINSON ET AL., CANCER INVESTIGATION, (1996), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 54 - 65 | - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 3410 - 3414 | - ANDERSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813 | - LUCA, L. D.; GIACOMELLI, G.; RIU, A., J. ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, no. 20, pages 6823 - 6825 | - FREEDMAN ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 121, no. 4, pages 950 - 7 | - BERNHARD ET AL., EXP LUNG RES, (2001), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 349 - 66 | - STOTLAND ET AL., PEDIATR PULMONOL, (2000), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 413 - 24 | - CONNOLLY ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 127, no. 1-2, pages 80 - 7 | - GARVEY ET AL., GENOMICS, (2002), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 146 - 9 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., NEUROMUSCUL DISORD, (2001), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 251 - 9 | - DUBOWITZ ET AL., NEURORNUSCUL DISORD, (2000), vol. 10, no. 4-5, pages 292 - 8 | - PILLERS ET AL., LARYNGOSCOPE, (1999), vol. 109, no. 8, pages 1310 - 2 | - KRAMER ET AL., NEUROMUSCUL DISORD, (1998), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 542 - 50 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL CELL PHYSIOL, (2001), vol. 281, no. 2, pages C690 - 9 | - SCHLENKER; BURBACH, J APPL PHYSIOL, (1991), vol. 71, no. 5, pages 1655 - 62 | - GASCHEN; BURGUNDER, ACTA NEUROPATHOL (BERL), (2001), vol. 101, no. 6, pages 591 - 600 | - FLETCHER ET AL., NEURORNUSCUL DISORD, (2001), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 239 - 43 | - VALENTINE ET AL., AM J MED GENET, (1992), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 352 - 6 | - CHAMBERLAIN; BENIAN, CURR BIOL, (2000), vol. 10, no. 21, pages R795 - 7 | - CULETTE; SATTELLE, HUM MOL GENET, (2000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 869 - 77 | - AJI ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1997), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 430 - 7 | - FANTAPPIE ET AL., LIFE SCI, (1992), vol. 50, no. 24, pages 1913 - 24 | - RICHARDSON ET AL., ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1998), vol. 138, no. 1, pages 135 - 46 | - HASLER-RAPACZ ET AL., AM J MED GENET, (1998), vol. 76, no. 5, pages 379 - 86 | - TSUTSUMI ET AL., ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG, (2000), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 118 - 21 | - HARSCH ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (1998), vol. 124, no. 2, pages 227 - 82 | - TANAKA ET AL., ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1995), vol. 114, no. 1, pages 73 - 82 | - VAIL; MACEWEN, CANCER INVEST, (2000), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 781 - 92 | - ROTH, VIVO, (1994), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 755 - 69 | - MORRIS ET AL., J LA STATE MED SOC, (1998), vol. 150, no. 4, pages 179 - 85 | - HOSOKAWA ET AL., TRANSGENIC RES, (2001), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 471 - 8 | - KADO ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, no. 6, pages 2395 - 8 | - WANG ET AL., INT J PANCREATOL, (2001), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 37 - 46 | - GHANEH ET AL., GENE THER, (2001), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 199 - 208 | - BRYANT ET AL., LAB INVEST, (2000), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 553 - 73 | - HOUGH ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, no. 23, pages 13853 - 8 | - HERBER ET AL., J VIROL, (1996), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 1873 - 81 | - FODDE; SMITS, TRENDS MOL MED, (2001), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 369 - 73 | - KURAGUCHI ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, no. 50, pages 5755 - 63 | - CICHOWSKI ET AL., SEMIN CANCER BIOL, (1996), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 291 - 8 | - HOWES ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (1994), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 342 - 51 | - WINDLE ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 343, no. 6259, pages 665 - 9 | - NISHIDA ET AL., CURR EYE RES, (1981), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 53 - 5 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., ACTA NEUROPATHOL (BERL), (1982), vol. 57, no. 2-3, pages 203 - 8 | - SCHARNHORST ET AL., CELL GROWTH DIFFER, (1997), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 133 - 43 | - MESFIN; BREECH, LAB ANIM SCI, (1996), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 321 - 6 | - MURPHY ET AL., ANTICANCER RES, (1987), vol. 7, no. 4B, pages 717 - 9 | - VOLLRATH ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, no. 22, pages 12584 - 9 | - HANITZSCH ET AL., ACTA ANAT (BASEL), (1998), vol. 162, no. 2-3, pages 119 - 26 | - JAISSLE ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2001), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 506 - 13 | - LAI ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (1980), vol. 98, no. 1, pages 281 - 4 | - KLOEHN ET AL., HORM METAB RES, (2001), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 394 - 401 | - VIERLING, BEST PRACT RES CLIN GASTROENTEROL, (2001), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 591 - 610 | - REIPERT ET AL., 7HROMB HAEMOST, (2000), vol. 84, no. 5, pages 826 - 32 | - JARVIS ET AL., THROMB HAEMOST, (1996), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 318 - 25 | - BI ET AL., NAT GENET, (1995), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 119 - 21 | - GALLO-PENN ET AL., HUM GENE THER, (1999), vol. 10, no. 11, pages 1791 - 802 | - CONNELLY ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, no. 9, pages 3273 - 81 | - SNYDER ET AL., NAT MED, (1999), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 64 - 70 | - WANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 21, pages 11563 - 6 | - FANG ET AL., GENE THER, (1996), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 217 - 22 | - MOUNT ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 2670 - 6 | - KAY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 6, pages 2353 - 7 | - LOZIER ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 93, no. 6, pages 1875 - 81 | - SANDERS ET AL., LAB INVEST, (1988), vol. 59, no. 4, pages 443 - 52 | - NICHOLS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, no. 7, pages 2455 - 9 | - JOHNSON; BOWIE, J LAB CLIN MED, (1992), vol. 120, no. 4, pages 553 - 8 | - BRINKHOUS ET AL., MAYO CLIN PROC, (1991), vol. 66, no. 7, pages 733 - 42 | - LEWIS ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, no. 6, pages 2152 - 6 | - RAJA ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL, (1994), vol. 86, no. 1, pages 156 - 62 | - SKOW ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 1043 - 52 | - BUSHINSKY ET AL., KIDNEY INT, (1999), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 234 - 43 | - BUSHINSKY ET AL., KIDNEY INT, (1995), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 1705 - 13 | - GRASES ET AL., SCAND J UROL NEPHROL, (1998), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 261 - 5 | - BURGESS ET AL., UROL RES, (1995), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 239 - 42 | - KUMAR ET AL., J UROL, (1991), vol. 146, no. 5, pages 1384 - 9 | - OKADA ET AL., HINYOKIKA KIYO, (1985), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 565 - 77 | - BLUESTONE ET AL., LAB INVEST, (1975), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 273 - 9 | - JONES ET AL., J UROL, (1991), vol. 145, no. 4, pages 868 - 74 | - ITATANI ET AL., INVEST UROL, (1979), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 234 - 40 | - BARLOW ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 17, pages 9915 - 9 | - INOUE ET AL., CANCER RES, (1986), vol. 46, no. 8, pages 3979 - 82 | - BROOKS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2002), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 6216 - 21 | - MONROY ET AL., BONE, (2002), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 352 - 9 | - VOGLER ET AL., PEDIATR DEV PATHOL., (2001), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 421 - 33 | - VOGLER ET AL., PEDIATR RES., (2001), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 342 - 8 | - WOLFE ET AL., MOL THER., (2000), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 552 - 6 | - MATZNER ET AL., GENE THER., (2002), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 53 - 63 | - SANGO ET AL., NEUROPATHOL APPL NEUROBIOL., (2002), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 23 - 34 | - BHATTACHARYYA ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 99 - 10 | - BHAUMIK ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 1389 - 96 | - D'HOOGE ET AL., BRAIN RES., (1999), vol. 847, no. 2, pages 352 - 6 | - D'HOOGE ET AL., NEUROSCI LETT., (1999), vol. 273, no. 2, pages 93 - 6 | - JALANKO ET AL., HUM MOL GENET., (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 265 - 72 | - CRAWLEY ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (1998), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 109 - 19 | - NORRDIN ET AL., BONE, (1995), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 485 - 9 | - MARCH ET AL., ACTA NEUROPATHOL (BERL)., (1997), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 164 - 72 | - OTTERBACH; STOFFEL, CELL, (1995), vol. 81, no. 7, pages 1053 - 6 | - JOLLY ET AL., BIRTH DEFECTS ORIG ARCTIC SER., (1975), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 273 - 8 | - KWIATKOWSKI ET AL., HUM MOL GENET., (2002), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 525 - 34 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20010717), vol. 98, no. 15, pages 8762 - 7 | - HINO, NIPPON RINSHO, (2000), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 1255 - 61 | - MIZUGUCHI ET AL., J NEUROPATHOL EXP NEUROL., (2000), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 188 - 9 | - HINO ET AL., PROG EXP TUMOR RES., (1999), vol. 35, pages 95 - 108 | - ONDA ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 687 - 95 | - SICINSKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, no. 4912, pages 1578 - 1580 | - BARTON-DAVIS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, no. 4, pages 375 - 381 | - MOAZED; NOLLER, NATURE, (1978), vol. 327, no. 6121, pages 389 - 394 | - WOODCOCK ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 3099 - 3103 | - SCHROEDER ET AL., EMBO J., (2000), vol. 19, pages 1 - 9 | US20020390747 | WO2003US19760 |