EP2292748 - Method for producing gamma-carboxylated proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medlmmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Medlmmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fenge, Christel AstraZeneca R & D Sodertalje S-151 85, Sodertalje / SE | 02 /
Lovgren, Ann AstraZeneca R & D Molndal S-431 83, Molndal / SE | 03 /
Thelin, Anders AstraZeneca R & D Molndal S-431 83, Molndal / SE | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Fenge, Christel AstraZeneca R & D Sodertalje S-151 85, Sodertalje / SE | ||
02 /
Lovgren, Ann AstraZeneca R & D Molndal S-431 83, Molndal / SE | |||
03 /
Thelin, Anders AstraZeneca R & D Molndal S-431 83, Molndal / SE | Representative(s) | Ttofi, Evangelia MedImmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB | [2014/19] |
Former [2011/46] | Myers, Jonathan David MedImmune Ltd. Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Bates, Rosica Florence Medlmmune Ltd. Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10185166.5 | 12.10.2004 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | GB20030024044 | 14.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0324044 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292748 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292748 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C12N9/74, C12P21/02 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C12N9/647 (EP,NO,US);
C12N9/6429 (EP,NO,US);
C12N15/63 (KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP,NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Extension states | AL | 01.10.2010 | HR | 01.10.2010 | LT | 01.10.2010 | LV | 01.10.2010 | MK | 01.10.2010 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung gamma-carboxylierter Proteine | [2011/10] | English: | Method for producing gamma-carboxylated proteins | [2011/10] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des protéines gamma-carboxylées | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04775534.3 / EP1678297 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040775534) is 19.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2004 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | PT | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.03.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.10.2004 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0229045 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * pages 11, 19 * * claim 7 * [Y] 1-14; | [X] - HALLGREN K W ET AL, "Carboxylase overexpression effects full carboxylation but poor release and secretion of factor IX: Implications for the release of vitamin K-dependent proteins", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20020101), vol. 41, doi:10.1021/BI026016E, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 15045 - 15055, XP002983284 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi026016e | [Y] - LUCAS BRIAN K ET AL, "High-level production of recombinant proteins in CHO cells using a dicistronic DHFR intron expression vector", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19960101), vol. 24, no. 9, doi:10.1093/NAR/24.9.1774, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1774 - 1779, XP002151702 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.9.1774 | by applicant | WO8803926 | WO9219636 | - RODDIE; LUDLAM, BLOOD REV., (1997), vol. 11, pages 169 - 177 | - WU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, no. 5038, pages 1634 - 1636 | - REHEMTULLA ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 4611 - 4615 | - STANLEY, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, no. 24, pages 16940 - 16944 | - VO ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1999), vol. 445, pages 256 - 260 | - BEGLEY ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 275, no. 46, pages 36245 - 36249 | - WALKER ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 276, no. 11, pages 7769 - 7774 | - BANDYOPADHYAY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 3, pages 1264 - 1269 | - CZERWIEC ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 269, pages 6162 - 6172 | - HALLGREN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, no. 50, pages 15045 - 15055 | - HARVEY ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 278, no. 10, pages 8363 - 8369 | - MALHOTRA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 279 - 287 | - JøRGENSEN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 6729 - 6734 | - RUSSO ET AL., BIOTECHNOL APPL BIOCHEM, (1991), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 222 - 233 | - FISCHER ET AL., J BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 129 - 136 | - HERLITSCHKA ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR. PURIF., (1996), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 358 - 364 | - RUSSO ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR. PURIF., (1997), vol. 10, pages 214 - 225 | - WU; SUTTIE, THROMB RES, (1999), vol. 96, no. 2, pages 91 - 98 | - COTE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, pages 11374 - 11380 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 521 - 530 | - WENGER ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1994), vol. 221, pages 416 - 418 | - MIZUSHIMA; NAGATA, NUC ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, page 5322 | - GOLDMAN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1996), vol. 21, pages 1013 - 1015 | - GORMAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1982), vol. 79, pages 6777 - 6781 | - SCHORPP ET AL., NUC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, pages 1787 - 1788 | - ROUET ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 267, pages 20765 - 20773 | - KOZAK, NUC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 8125 - 8148 | - KOZAK, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8301 - 83051987 | - BERKNER; PUDOTA, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1998), vol. 95, pages 446 - 471 | - LINGENFELTER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 8234 - 8243 | - BERKNER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 446 - 471 | - BERKNER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6242 - 6246 | - Comprehensive Medicinal Chemistry, PERGAMON PRESS, (1990), vol. 5 | - Drugs and the pharmaceutical sciences; Protein formulation and delivery, MARCEL DEKKER INC, (2000), vol. 99 | - DNA Cloning 3: A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1995), vol. I, II, I | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS | - JOSIC ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (2003), vol. 790, pages 183 - 197 | - MAO ET AL., JBC, (1998), vol. 273, pages 30086 - 30091 | - STIG ET AL., BLOOD COAGULATION AND FIBRINOLYSIS, (2003), vol. 14, pages 457 - 462 | - BERKNER; PUDOTA, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 446 - 471 | - LINGENFELTER; BERKNER, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 8234 - 8243 |