EP2266549 - METHOD OF MAKING PARTICLES FOR USE IN A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/52] | Method of making particles for use in a pharmaceutical composition | ||
[2019/12] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vectura Limited 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | [2019/32] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Vectura Limited 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANIFORTH, John Nicholas Vectura Limited High Trees Bloomfield Road Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA2 2ST / GB | 02 /
MORTON, David Alexander Vodden Vectura Limited 2nd Floor Flat Linsley House Beechen Cliff Road Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA2 4QR / GB | 03 /
MUSA, Rosella Chiesi Farmaceutici SpA Chiesi Farmaceutici SpA Via Palermo 26/Q 43100 Parma / IT | [2019/12] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
Staniforth, John, Nicholas Vectura Limited High Trees Bloomfield Road Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA2 2ST / GB | ||
02 /
Morton, David, Alexander, Vodden Vectura Limited 2nd Floor Flat Linsley House Beechen Cliff Road Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA2 4QR / GB | |||
03 /
Musa, Rosella Chiesi Farmaceutici SpA Chiesi Farmaceutici SpA Via Palermo 26/Q I-43100, Parma / IT | Representative(s) | Summersell, Richard John, et al Vectura Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GZ / GB | [2019/32] |
Former [2010/52] | McNamara, Kathryn, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10185471.9 | 27.06.2001 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | GB20000029263 | 30.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0029263 | EP20000113608 | 27.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00113608 | WO2001GB01732 | 17.04.2001 Original published format: PCT/GB01/01732 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2266549 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2266549 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2266549 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/72, A61K9/14 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/1688 (US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (US);
A61K9/1623 (US);
A61P11/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Partikeln zur Verwendung in einer pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzung | [2019/30] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING PARTICLES FOR USE IN A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2019/12] | French: | Procedé permettant de produire des particules destinées à être utilisées dans une composition pharmaceutique | [2019/30] |
Former [2010/52] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Partikeln zur Verwendung in einer pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzung | ||
Former [2010/52] | Method of making particles for use in a pharmaceutical composition | ||
Former [2010/52] | Procedé permettant de produire des particules destinées à être utilisées dans une composition pharmaceutique | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01947612.6 / EP1296651 | EP07120591.8 / EP1913939 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010947612) is 12.05.2003 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2020
19.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2020
19.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2020/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Sardharwala, Fatema Elyasali GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | 17.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.10.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.02.2022 | 24.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.04.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 18   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | LU | 27.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | GB | 26.06.2021 | IE | 27.06.2021 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
GB | 26.06.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
GB | 26.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8705213 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT]) [X] 10,12-15 * examples 1A,2 *; | [X]EP0260241 (DRACO AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,7,10-12,14,15 * examples 1,7 *; | [XD]WO9623485 (CO ORDINATED DRUG DEV [GB], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 23, line 23 - page 25, line 14 * * examples 3-13 * * figures 4A,4B *; | [X]WO9831346 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 10-15 * page 39, line 26 - page 40, line 6 * * example 5 *; | [X]WO0028979 (SKYEPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [X] 10-12,14,15 * page 15, line 30 - line 32 * * examples 1-6 *; | [X]WO0033789 (R P SCHERER INC [US], et al) [X] 10-12,14,15 * page 4, line 4 - line 7 * * page 6, line 7 - line 10 * * example - *; | [X]WO0033811 (VECTURA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 10-15 * example 5 *; | [E]WO0178693 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [E] 1-4,6-12,14,15 * claim - ** examples 1-3,7D,7E,8,9 * | by applicant | US4349542 | WO9623485 | WO9723485 | - A. E. HAWKINS, The Shape of Powder-Particle Outlines, WILEY | - J. PHARM. PHARMACOL, (1987), vol. 39, pages 966 - 972 | Opposition | GB1381872 | WO9623485 | WO0053158 | WO0178693 | EP2283817 | - Anonymous, "formoterol fumarate", British National Formulary, (20200429), pages 1 - 4, XP055762002 | - Anonymous, "Formoterol. Compound Summary", PubChem, (20200429), pages 1 - 2, XP055762003 | - NUHA KASSEM, thesis submitted to Kings College, (19900000), XP002687372 | - L. S. DUBROVINSKY ET AL., "The hardest known oxide", Nature, London, (20010405), vol. 410, doi:10.1038/35070650, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 653 - 654, XP002379183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35070650 | - Göran Alderborn, Nyström, Christer, "Pharmaceutical Powder Compaction Technology. Excerpt", Marcel Dekker, (19960101), pages 292 - 299, XP055761993 | - Joseph I. Goldstein, "Scanning Electron Microscopy & X-Ray Microanalysis. Excerpt Chapter 24", Springer, (20170101), pages 414 - 417, XP055761987 | - Joseph I. Goldstein, "Scanning Electron Microscopy & X-Ray Microanalysis. Excerpt Chapter 10", Springer, (20030101), pages 491 - 492, XP055761989 |