Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.02.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
05.11.2012 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
29.10.2012 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
17.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.05.2012 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
17.04.2012 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.03.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
13.12.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.12.2011 | First examination report | |
29.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
11.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.12.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
08.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |