Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008151240 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80698407 | 05.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0233631 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0233625 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0233619 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02082710 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2002 | A3 | WO02082710 | 17.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014288992 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414299900 | 09.06.2014 | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | US20719808 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7895047 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2009125277 | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | US35340809 | 14.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8788312 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2009006169 | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | US20719808 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8655698 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2014 | B2 | US2008126171 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80698407 | 05.06.2007 | US94603201 | 04.09.2001 | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US79991404 | 12.03.2004 | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | US49077406 | 21.07.2006 | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | US94715701 | 04.09.2001 | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7987108 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2011 | B2 | US2006265261 | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94603201 | 04.09.2001 | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US79991404 | 12.03.2004 | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | US49077406 | 21.07.2006 | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | US94715701 | 04.09.2001 | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7124059 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2006 | B2 | US2004254764 | 16.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94603201 | 04.09.2001 | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US79991404 | 12.03.2004 | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | US94715701 | 04.09.2001 | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005502134 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0209881 | 02.09.2002 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2284779 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02797671 | 02.09.2002 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1436749 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP0209881 | 02.09.2002 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1428163 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | EP0209885 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1425692 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP0209882 | 02.09.2002 | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1386277 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2007 | A4 | EP1386277 | 04.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | US0209303 | 21.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1348188 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2006 | A4 | EP1348188 | 01.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0132576 | 16.10.2001 | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1337947 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2006 | A4 | EP1337947 | 27.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0132154 | 16.10.2001 | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9113901 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | US0129384 | 18.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002248704 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | US0209303 | 21.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1339102 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0132576 | 16.10.2001 | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1175002 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0132154 | 16.10.2001 | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2273437 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | EP02779301 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2425801 | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | US0129384 | 18.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2425803 | 21.12.2010 | C | CA2425803 | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0132576 | 16.10.2001 | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2425940 | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0132154 | 16.10.2001 | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2443648 | 17.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | US0209303 | 21.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2459565 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0209881 | 02.09.2002 | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2459566 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0209882 | 02.09.2002 | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2459568 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | EP0209885 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6738748 | 18.05.2004 | B2 | US2002143421 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82563301 | 03.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7031941 | 18.04.2006 | B2 | US2002194160 | 19.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94616001 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7502744 | 10.03.2009 | B2 | US2005004821 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94702401 | 04.09.2001 | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6980959 | 27.12.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US69079300 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03023664 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2003 | A8 | WO03023664 | 20.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94715701 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03021505 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03021504 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2003 | A8 | WO03021504 | 13.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US94603201 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03021503 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2003 | A8 | WO03021503 | 13.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03021502 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2003 | A8 | WO03021502 | 13.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4503634B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2010 | B2 | JP2007272930 | 18.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7457762 | 25.11.2008 | B2 | US2004162811 | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94603201 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7461008 | 02.12.2008 | B2 | US2005283392 | 22.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94713601 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6820038 | 16.11.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US94689401 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7440906 | 21.10.2008 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US94609501 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7457763 | 25.11.2008 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US94715701 | 04.09.2001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1425692 |