Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8004154 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2011 | B2 | US2011080069 | 07.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0904774 | 06.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011103451 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0904774 | 06.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2309559 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2013 | B1 | EP2309559 | 13.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0904774 | 06.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2951014 | 25.11.2011 | B1 | FR2951014 | 08.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0904774 | 06.10.2009 |