EP2421006 - Method for producing isotopes, in particular method for producing radioisotopes by means of gamma-beam irradiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Geschwister-Scholl-Platz 1 80539 München / DE | For all designated states INSTITUT MAX VON LAUE - PAUL LANGEVIN 6, Rue Jules Horowitz 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habs, Dietrich Ambergerstrasse 15 81679 München / DE | 02 /
Köster, Ulli c/o Institut Max von Laue - Paul Langevin BP 156, 6 rue Jules Horowitz 38042 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Lucke, Andreas Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10186576.4 | 05.10.2010 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | EP20100008708 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10008708 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421006 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G21G1/12 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
G21G1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Isotopen, insbesondere Verfahren zur Herstellung von Radioisotopen mittels Gammastrahlung | [2012/08] | English: | Method for producing isotopes, in particular method for producing radioisotopes by means of gamma-beam irradiation | [2012/08] | French: | Procédé de production d'isotopes, en particulier le procédé de production de radio-isotopes au moyen d'irradiation à rayonnement gamma | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002080903 (IWAMURA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] * | [I] - HIRO EJIRI, "Laser Electron Photon Isotope Transmutation via GDR by Medium-E photons", LASER ELECTRON SCATTER PHOTONS AT LIGHT SOURCES FOR NUCLEAR & ALLIED RESEARCH, Canadian Light Source, Saskatoon, Canada, (20100421), XP002636230 [I] 1-15 * all slides shown * | [I] - M. FUJIWARA, "MeV photons from inverse Compton scattering and applications for science", LASER ELECTRON SCATTER PHOTONS AT LIGHT SOURCES FOR NUCLEAR & ALLIED RESEARCH, Canadian Light Source, Saskatoon, Canada, (20100421), XP002636231 [I] 1-15 * all slides shown * | by applicant | - O.D. MASLOV, "Preparation of 225Ac by 226Ra(?,n) Photonuclear Reaction on an Electron Accelerator, MT-25 Microtron", RADIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 48, page 195 | - R. HAJIMA; N. NAKAMURA; S. SAKANAKA; Y. KOBAYASHI, "KEK Report 2007-7", JAEA-RESEARCH, (200802), pages 2008 - 032 | - F.ALBERT ET AL., "Isotope specific detection of low-density materials with laser-based monoenergetic gamma-rays", OPTIC LETTERS, (2010), vol. 35, page 354 | - D. HABS ET AL., "Dense laser-driven electron sheets as relativistic mirrors for coherent production of brilliant X-ray and y-ray beams", APPL. PHYS. B, (2008), vol. 93, page 349 | - M. S. DEWEY ET AL., PHYS. REF. C, (2006), vol. 73, page 044303 |