EP2439000 - Polymer layer composite with ferroelectric characteristics and method for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Gebäude Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Gebäude Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lovera-Prieto, Deliani, Dr. c/o Bayer MaterialScienceAG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Jenninger, Werner, Dr. c/o Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/15] | Application number, filing date | 10186617.6 | 05.10.2010 | [2012/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439000 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, H01L41/193, H01L41/26, B32B3/28, B32B27/00 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
B32B3/28 (EP);
B06B1/06 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
H10N30/098 (EP);
H10N30/857 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polymerschichtenverbund mit Ferroelektret-Eigenschaften und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2012/15] | English: | Polymer layer composite with ferroelectric characteristics and method for producing same | [2012/15] | French: | Composite en couche polymère doté de propriétés ferroélectriques et son procédé de fabrication | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010066348 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al); | by applicant | US4654546 | DE3905177 | WO2006053528 | WO2010066348 |