EP2439238 - Polypropylene with living hinge properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friel, David Mysundegade 3 3th Copenhagen V, 1668 / DK | 02 /
Reisecker, Michael Oberham 10 4921 Hohenzell / AT | 03 /
Doshev, Petar Am Herzog Wilhelm Weg 9; Top II 4040 Linz / AT | 04 /
Kheirandish, Saeid Macherscheider Str. 124 41468 Neuss / DE | 05 /
Simon, Sybille Gesellenhausstraße 19/1/4 4020 Linz / AT | [2013/01] |
Former [2012/15] | 01 /
Friel, David Mysundegade 3 3th Copenhagen V, 1668 / DK | ||
02 /
Reisecker, Michael Oberham 10 4921 Hohenzell / AT | |||
03 /
Doshev, Petar Am Herzog Wilhelm Weg 9; Top II 4040 Linz / AT | |||
04 /
Kheirandish, Saeid Europaplatz 6, OG, Top 8 4020 Linz / AT | |||
05 /
Simon, Sybille Gesellenhausstraße 19/1/4 4020 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Lux, Berthold, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Lux, Berthold, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/15] | Lux, Berthold, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Postfach 330523 80065 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10186753.9 | 06.10.2010 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439238 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439238 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/14, C08F10/06, C08F297/08, E05D1/04 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,CN,US);
F16C11/12 (US);
C08F110/06 (EP,CN,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,CN,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,CN,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/142, C08L23/142 (CN);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12 (US,CN,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12 (US,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/15] | C08L23/14, C08F10/06, C08F297/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Polypropylen mit Filmscharniereigenschaften | [2012/15] | English: | Polypropylene with living hinge properties | [2012/15] | French: | Polypropylène doté de propriétés de charnières vivantes | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2010 | AL | 05.12.2012 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | RS | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | NO | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 06.10.2010 | |
AT | 05.12.2012 | ||
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.10.2010 | |
AT | 05.12.2012 | ||
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
NO | 05.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1484345 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) | by applicant | EP0591224 | WO9924479 | WO0068315 | EP1818365 | WO2007122239 |