EP2308710 - Commercial vehicle tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erhard GmbH Güglingstrasse 94 73529 Schwäbisch-Gmünd / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Erhard & Söhne GmbH Güglingstr. 94 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanek, Steffen Peter-und-Paul-Str. 20 73525, Schwaebisch Gmuend / DE | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Zanek, Steffen Peter-und-Paul-Str. 20 73525, Schwaebisch Gmuend / DE | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele Magna International Europe AG Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 8041 Graz-Liebenau / AT | [2012/36] |
Former [2011/15] | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10186806.5 | 07.10.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | DE20091045500 | 08.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009045500 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308710 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308710 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/03, B60K15/063, B60K15/067 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
B60K15/03177 (EP);
B60K15/063 (EP);
B60K15/067 (EP);
F02M37/0088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Nutzfahrzeugtank | [2011/15] | English: | Commercial vehicle tank | [2011/15] | French: | Réservoir de véhicule utilitaire | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2010 | AL | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | HR | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | RS | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | NO | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RS | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
NO | 05.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102006056430 (ERHARD & SOEHNE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,11 * paragraphs [0049] , [0055]; figure 4 * [Y] 5-8 [I] 9; | [Y]DE19605703 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [Y] 5-8 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]EP1974975 (ERHARD & SOEHNE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 7,11 * | by applicant | DE202005021121U |