EP2375847 - Methods and apparatus for operating a wireless communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Fujitsu Optical Components Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Yanling 29B, 102 Wangjingdongyuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/41] | 01 /
Lu, Yanling 29B, 102 Wangjingdongyuan 100102, Chaoyang District / CN | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/50] |
Former [2011/41] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10186857.8 | 22.08.2008 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375847 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2375847 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (KR);
H04L1/12 (KR);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04W74/0866 (EP,US);
H04L2027/002 (EP,US);
H04W74/002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben eines drahtlosen Kommunikationssystems | [2011/41] | English: | Methods and apparatus for operating a wireless communications system | [2011/41] | French: | Procédés et appareil pour le fonctionnement d'un système de communication sans fil | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08162821.6 / EP2157829 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080162821) is 04.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.12.2013 | [2016/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0021320 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]EP1742501 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]EP1915007 (TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]WO2008054112 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); |