EP2439943 - System and method to prevent manipulation of transmitted video data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. 22-24, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. Route de Genève 22-24 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudelski, André Chemin de Bellingard 1095 Lutry / CH | 02 /
Nicolas, Christophe Chemin de Sous-Allens 15 1162 St-Prex / CH | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2012/15] | Application number, filing date | 10186869.3 | 07.10.2010 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439943 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/913, G11B20/00, H04N7/16, H04N7/173, H04N7/24 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
H04N21/43635 (EP,US);
H04N21/44236 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
G11B20/00166 (EP,US);
G11B20/00173 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Vermeidung der Manipulation übertragener Videodaten | [2012/15] | English: | System and method to prevent manipulation of transmitted video data | [2012/15] | French: | Système et procédé pour prévenir la manipulation de données vidéo transmises | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102008003364 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059]; claims 1,3 *; | [I]WO2006059053 (UNIV ST ANDREWS [GB], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 10, line 5 - line 17; figure 4 * * page 15, line 22 - page 16, line 9 *; | [I]WO2007148264 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 15, line 11 - line 19 * * page 1, line 6 - line 16; figure 8 * | by applicant | WO2004073292 |