EP2309632 - Half bridge resonant DC-DC control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20864 Agrate Brianza / IT | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Monza Brianza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adragna, Claudio Via Pellizza da Volpedo, 2 20052 Monza / IT | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10186873.5 | 07.10.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01738 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091738 | IT2010MI01398 | 28.07.2010 Original published format: IT MI20101398 | [2011/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309632 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2309632 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/337, H02M1/08 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
H02M1/08 (EP,US);
H02M3/3376 (EP,US);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für einen Halbbrücken-Resonanzwandler | [2011/15] | English: | Half bridge resonant DC-DC control device | [2011/15] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour un convertisseur résonant à demi-pont | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2010 | AL | 29.05.2013 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | HR | 29.05.2013 | IT | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | MK | 29.05.2013 | MT | 29.05.2013 | NL | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | RS | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | SM | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | NO | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | IE | 07.10.2013 | LU | 07.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008130328 (CHOI HANG SEOK [KR]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,14,16,17 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0069]; figures 3-6 *; | [Y]GB2306062 (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,14,16,17 * page 6, line 12 - line 16; figures 1,2,4A-4D * * page 9, line 4 - line 16 * | [X] - NALBANT M K, "A new and improved control technique greatly simplifies the design of ZVS resonant inverters and DC/DC power supplies", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 1995. APEC '95. C ONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 1995., TENTH ANNUAL DALLAS, TX, USA 5-9 MARCH 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/APEC.1995.469095, (19950305), ISBN 978-0-7803-2482-4, pages 694 - 701, XP010147721 [X] 1,4,6,7,16 * page 697 - page 700 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.1995.469095 | by applicant | - H. PINHEIRO; P. K. JAIN; G. JO6S, "Self-Sustained Oscillating Resonant Converters Operating Above the Resonant Frequency", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, (199909), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 803 - 814 |