EP2314391 - Aligning device for high aspect ratio slabs or plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS PLC Faraday House Sir William Siemens Square Frimley Camberley GU16 8QD / GB | [2013/32] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies Ltd. Unit S Europa Link Sheffield Airport Business Park Sheffield, Yorkshire S9 1XU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Champion, Nicholas 90 Edgedale Road Sheffield, Yorkshire S7 2BR / GB | 02 /
Jones, Martyn Rowney, Northleigh Lane Colehill, Dorset BH21 2PH / GB | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10187027.7 | 08.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | GB20090018206 | 19.10.2009 Original published format: GB 0918206 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2314391 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2314391 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21B39/16 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
B21B39/16 (EP,GB,US);
B21B1/22 (EP,US);
B21B2001/028 (EP,US);
B21B2273/14 (EP,US);
B21B2273/22 (EP,US);
B21B39/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ausrichtungsvorrichtung für Fliesen oder Platten mit hohem Aspektverhältnis | [2011/17] | English: | Aligning device for high aspect ratio slabs or plates | [2011/17] | French: | Dispositif d'alignement pour dalles ou plaques à rapport d'aspect élevé | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1342220 (LEWIS HARRY A, et al); | [A]EP0287021 (BRITISH STEEL CORP [GB]); | [A]WO9924186 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) |