EP2316344 - Three dimensional pulsed wave spectrum ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus and three dimensional pulsed wave spectrum data generation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon do / KR | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states MEDISON CO., LTD. 114 Yangdeokwon-ri Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 250-875 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Beom Gyu 203-1302, Eunhaeng Maeul 2-Danji Apt., Sikso-dong Ilsandong-gu 410-774, Goyang Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Yang, Eun Ho 7-701, Lotte Apt., Junggye 2-dong Nowon-gu 139-784, Seoul / KR | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10187085.5 | 11.10.2010 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | KR20090102586 | 28.10.2009 Original published format: KR 20090102586 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316344 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/14, G01S15/89 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
A61B8/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/145 (EP,US);
A61B8/469 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US);
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
G01S7/52066 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (KR);
A61B8/523 (EP,US);
G01S7/52063 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ultraschalldiagnosegerät mit dreidimensional gepulstem Wellenspektrum und Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines dreidimensional gepulsten Wellenspektrums | [2011/18] | English: | Three dimensional pulsed wave spectrum ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus and three dimensional pulsed wave spectrum data generation method | [2011/18] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic par ultrasons à spectre d'ondes pulsées tridimensionnel et procédé de génération des données de spectre d'ondes pulsées | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5474073 (SCHWARTZ GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 28 *; | [X]US6419633 (ROBINSON ANDREW L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 9-11 * * column 7, line 25 - column 7, line 50 * * sentence 66, paragraph 8 - sentence 46, paragraph 9 *; | [A]US2005113689 (GRITZKY ARTHUR [AT]) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US2005203404 (FREIBURGER PAUL D [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] *; | [A]WO2008044173 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 6, line 24 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2009149759 (BABA TATSURO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4,6 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0041] * |