EP2340733 - Buckling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qbas Co., Ltd. 1F, No. 98-2, Fuguo Road Taipei / TW | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiue, Chih-Cheng QBAS CO., LTD. 1F, No. 98-2, Fuguo Rd. Taipei / TW | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Michalski, Stefan Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10187216.6 | 12.10.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | TW098222723U | 04.12.2009 Original published format: TW 098222723 U | TW099200227U | 07.01.2010 Original published format: TW 099200227 U | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2340733 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2340733 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63B33/00, A44B11/06 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A63B33/002 (EP,US);
A61F9/027 (EP,US);
A63B31/08 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4016 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4077 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45246 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45597 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | A44B11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schnalle | [2011/27] | English: | Buckling device | [2011/27] | French: | Dispositif de boucle | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006010585 (CHIANG HERMAN [TW]) [A] 1,7,8* paragraphs [0016] - [0019] *; | [A]US2006230584 (PAN CHEN-LIEH [TW]) [A] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] *; | [A]US2009100645 (WENG JIN-XIAN [CN]) [A] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] * |