Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2657911 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187267 | 12.10.2010 | KR20090097203 | 13.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8644552 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2014 | B2 | US2011085704 | 14.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090097203 | 13.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101626065B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B1 | KR20110040074 | 20.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090097203 | 13.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2317474 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090097203 | 13.10.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP2657911 |