EP2317474 - Markerless motion capturing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Young Ran Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung Sin Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 03 /
Park, Du-Sik Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Jacobs, Bart Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10187267.9 | 12.10.2010 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | KR20090097203 | 13.10.2009 Original published format: KR 20090097203 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2317474 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/10004 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Markierungslose Bewegungserfassungsvorrichtung und -verfahren | [2011/18] | English: | Markerless motion capturing apparatus and method | [2011/18] | French: | Appareil et procédé de capture du mouvement sans marqueur | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2018 | 24.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | 20.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | EP13178227.8 / EP2657911 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - TAKAHASHI K ET AL, "Remarks on Simple Motion Capture Using Heuristic Rules and Monte Carlo Filter", IMAGE AND GRAPHICS, 2009. ICIG '09. FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090920), ISBN 978-1-4244-5237-8, pages 808 - 813, XP031652769 [X] 1-5,8,10-14 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,9,15 | [Y] - JANG-HEE YOO ET AL, "Automated Human Recognition by Gait using Neural Network", IMAGE PROCESSING THEORY, TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, 2008. IPTA 2008. FIRST WORKSHOPS ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081123), ISBN 978-1-4244-3321-6, pages 1 - 6, XP031404063 [Y] 6,7,15 * section 2.3 * | [Y] - FEIFEI HUO ET AL, "Markerless human motion capture and pose recognition", IMAGE ANALYSIS FOR MULTIMEDIA INTERACTIVE SERVICES, 2009. WIAMIS '09. 10TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090506), ISBN 978-1-4244-3609-5, pages 13 - 16, XP031467258 [Y] 9 * section 3.4 * | [A] - KAZUHIKO TAKAHASHI ET AL, "Remarks on markerless human motion capture from voxel reconstruction with simple human model", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 2008. IROS 2008. IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080922), ISBN 978-1-4244-2057-5, pages 755 - 760, XP031348109 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - J. VIGNOLA, J.-F. LALONDE, AND R. BERGEVIN, "Progressive human skeleton fitting.", PROC. OF THE 16TH CONFERENCE ON VISION INTERFACE, (20030611), pages 35 - 42, XP002618785 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - POPPE ET AL, "Vision-based human motion analysis: An overview", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20070901), vol. 108, no. 1-2, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 4 - 18, XP022227939 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MOESLUND T B ET AL, "A Survey of Computer Vision-Based Human Motion Capture", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20010301), vol. 81, no. 3, doi:10.1006/CVIU.2000.0897, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 231 - 268, XP004434103 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cviu.2000.0897 | Examination | - C. Rafael Gonzalez ET AL, "Digital Image Processing - Chapter 11", Digital Image Processing, New Jersey, Pearson Education, Inc., (20080101), pages 795 - 800, ISBN 978-0-13-505267-9, XP055450374 |