01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
08.11.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
30.11.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
29.11.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.11.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2018 |
First examination report |
|
24.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
28.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
22.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.10.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
24.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
02.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
23.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] |
13.05.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] |