EP2315106 - Method and system for detecting control commands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANG & OLUFSEN A/S Bang og Olufsen Allé 1 7600 Struer / DK | [2019/32] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states BANG & OLUFSEN A/S Peter Bangs Vej 15 7600 Struer / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ejlersen, Finn Harrestrupvej 57B 7500, Holstebro / DK | 02 /
Gadeberg, Jesper Lille Ørskovvej 14, Humlum 7600, Struer / DK | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Hussey, Paul Anthony, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 10187568.0 | 14.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | DK20090001137 | 20.10.2009 Original published format: DK 200901137 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2315106 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2315106 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044, G06F3/042 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06F3/044 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0339 (EP);
G06F2203/04106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2011/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erkennung von Steuerbefehlen | [2011/17] | English: | Method and system for detecting control commands | [2011/17] | French: | Procédé et système pour la détection de commandes de contrôle | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2020 | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/11] | 01.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 10.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5598527 (DEBRUS MARIE-HELENE [FR], et al) [A] 3,5,8-10,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, line 43 - column 4, line 51 * * column 5, line 6 - column 5, line 56; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2002158838 (SMITH BARTON A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US2003202003 (MARMAROPOULOS GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10312090 (FIRST INT COMPUTER INC [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008134102 (MOVOLD CATHRINE [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0063] , [0066] , [0070] , [0079]; figures 1,2,4-9,16,17 *; | [A]US2008316178 (CALIKSAN TURAN [SE], et al) [A] 3,14* paragraph [0049]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2009028921 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 8,9 * paragraph [0087]; figures 1-3,9-11 *; | [I]WO2009067224 (CIRQUE CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009189829 (HIRAMATSU RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2007262951 | US2008246723 | US2009160809 | US2009224776 |