EP2292913 - Controlling exhaust gas recirculation in a turbocharged engine system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shutty, John 6899 Langle Ct. Clarkston Michigan, DE 48346 / US | 02 /
Joergl, Volker Primelweg 6 2384 Breitenfurt / AT | 03 /
Müller, Volker Mainzer Strasse 52a 55218 Ingelheim / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Shutty, John 6899 Langle Ct. Clarkston Michigan, DE 48346 / US | ||
02 /
Joergl, Volker Primelweg 6 2384 Breitenfurt / AT | |||
03 /
Müller, Volker Mainzer Strasse 52a 55218 Ingelheim / DE | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Shutty, John 6899 Langle Ct. Clarkston Michigan, DE 48346 / US | ||
02 /
Joergl, Volker 1601 N. Hadley Road Ortonville Michigan, DE 48462 / US | |||
03 /
Müller, Volker Raiffelsenstrasse 8 55578 Vendersheim / DE | Representative(s) | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10187695.1 | 20.12.2006 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20050752415P | 20.12.2005 Original published format: US 752415 P | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292913 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292913 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01N11/00, F02D41/00, F02M25/07, F02B37/00, F02B37/24, F02D9/04, // F01N9/00 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
F02B37/00 (EP,KR,US);
F02D21/08 (KR);
F01N11/002 (EP,US);
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
F02D41/0072 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/06 (EP,US);
F02M26/38 (EP,US);
F02D9/04 (EP,US);
F02M26/10 (EP,US);
F02M26/15 (EP,US);
F02M26/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | F02D41/00, F02M25/07, // F01N9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/46] |
Former [2011/10] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Steuerung zur Abgasrückführung in turboaufgeladenen Brennkraftmaschinen | [2011/10] | English: | Controlling exhaust gas recirculation in a turbocharged engine system | [2011/10] | French: | Contrôle de recirculation de gaz d'échappement dans des moteurs à combustion interne turbochargés | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06848058.1 / EP1963646 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060848058) is 15.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.01.2016 | GB | 11.02.2016 | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/50] | FR | 11.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002021625 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US2004050375 (ARNOLD STEVEN DON [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0024] , [0026] * * claim 18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1420159 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0030] - [0035] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004149272 (KURTZ ERIC MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0047] , [0048] , [0091] , [0105] - [0108] * * claims 8,9 * * figures 4,5,16D *; | [A]US6932063 (HU HAORAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] ** figure 6 * | by applicant | US20050752415 |