EP2314928 - Appliance with advanced controls, in particular a cooking oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primax S.r.l. Via Gemona, 14/16 Z.I. Ponterosso 33078 San Vito al Tagliamento (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Primax S.r.l. Via Enrico Mattei 1 33083 Chions Pordenone / IT | ||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Primax S.r.l. Via Enrico Mattei 1 33083 Chions Pordenone / IT | ||
For all designated states ESC S.r.l. Via del Candel 55/D 32100 Belluno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marson, Vittorio c/o PRIMAX S.r.l. Via Enrico Mattei 1 33083, Chions, Pordenone / IT | 02 /
Longi, Mauro c/o PRIMAX S.r.l. Via Enrico Mattei 1 33083, Chions, Pordenone / IT | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2011/17] | Application number, filing date | 10187775.1 | 15.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | IT2009PN00060 | 22.10.2009 Original published format: IT PN20090060 | [2011/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2314928 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2314928 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
F24C7/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gerät mit erweiterter Steuereinrichtung, inbesondere ein Backofen | [2011/19] | English: | Appliance with advanced controls, in particular a cooking oven | [2011/17] | French: | Appareil pourvu de commandes avancées, en particulier un four de cuisson | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/17] | Gerät mit erweiterte Steuereinrichtung, inbesondere ein Backofen | Examination procedure | 12.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102005049802 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [[0011]] - paragraph [[0041]]; figures 9-12 * [A] 9-12; | [A]EP1384951 (THIRODE GRANDES CUISINES POLIGNY [FR]) [A] 9-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1273851 (THERMA GROSSKUECHEN PRODUKTION [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [[0021]] *; | [A]DE10313401 (ZUBLER GERAETEBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0611499 | GB2443296 | WO03088176 |