Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2315355 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2017 | B1 | EP2315355 | 18.09.2013 | A3 | EP2315355 | 27.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009050508 | 23.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009050508 | 19.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009050508 | 23.10.2009 |