EP2334093 - Stream receiving device, stream receiving method, stream transmission device, stream transmission method and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagishi, Yasuaki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Kitazato, Naohisa c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/26] | Moulin, Bénédicte, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/12] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Haines, Miles John L.S. D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10188195.1 | 20.10.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | JP20090247516 | 28.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009247516 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2334093 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N21/433, H04N21/438, H04N21/63, H04N21/6405, H04N7/24 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
H04N21/4384 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/238 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stromempfangsvorrichtung, Stromempfangsverfahren, Stromübertragungsvorrichtung, Stromübertragungsverfahren und Computerprogramm | [2011/24] | English: | Stream receiving device, stream receiving method, stream transmission device, stream transmission method and computer program | [2011/24] | French: | Dispositif de réception de flux, procédé de réception de flux, dispositif de transmission de flux, procédé de transmission de flux et programme informatique | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 09.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2015 | 15.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/05] | 27.09.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006041784 (WAVE7 OPTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 2,4 * figures 4, 6, 7 * * page 12, line 21 - line 27 * * page 13, line 14 - page 14, line 24 *; | [A]WO2007064159 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1,5,7-10,12,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0041], [0052], [0077] *; | [A]WO2008038961 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1,3,7-9,14,15 * figures 1, 3, 6 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]WO2008054100 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-10,12,14,15 * figures 6, 7 * * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 16 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 7 *; | [Y]WO2008069613 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-10,12,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [A] - HYUN LEE ET AL, "A Structure for 2D/3D Mixed Service Based on Terrestrial DMB System", 3DTV CONFERENCE, 2007, IEEE, PI, (20070501), ISBN 978-1-4244-0721-7, pages 1 - 4, XP031158177 [A] 1,5,7-10,14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009247516 |