EP2348550 - Package structure and LED package structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lite-on Electronics(Guangzhou) Limited No. 25 Guangpu West Road, Guangzhou Science Park Guangzhou High and new Technology Industry Development zone Guangzhou / CN | For all designated states Lite-On Technology Corporation 22FI., 392, Ruey Kuang Road Neihu, Taipei / TW | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Silitek Electronic (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd. No. 25 Guangpu West Road Guangzhou Science Park Guangzhou High and New Technology Industry Development Zone Guangzhou / CN | ||
For all designated states Lite-On Technology Corporation 22FI., 392, Ruey Kuang Road Neihu, Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Chen-Hsiu 4F, No.10, Lane 92 Yumin Rd. Taipei County Tucheng City / TW | 02 /
Kao, Chih-Chiang 7F, No.89, Ln.136, Sec.3 Zhongshan Rd. Taipei County 235 Zhonghe City / TW | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Lin, Chen-Hsiu 4F, No.10, Lane 92 Yumin Rd. Taipei County Tucheng City / TW | ||
02 /
Kao, Chih-Chiang 7F, No.89, Ln.136, Sec.3 Zhongshan Rd. Taipei County 235 Zhonghe City / TW | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188196.9 | 20.10.2010 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | CN20101000789 | 20.01.2010 Original published format: CN201010000789 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348550 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2348550 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2348550 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/48, // H01L33/62, H01L33/64 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L33/64 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | H01L33/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2011/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verpackungsstruktur und LED-Verpackungsstruktur | [2011/30] | English: | Package structure and LED package structure | [2011/30] | French: | Structure d'emballage et structure d'emballage de DEL | [2011/30] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 20.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2010 | AL | 09.09.2015 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | MT | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | RS | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | IE | 20.10.2015 | LU | 20.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
IT | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
IT | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009094282 (COSMO ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-3,7,9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]US2008041625 (CHEONG CHENG SIU [CN], et al) [Y] 1,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]WO2004053933 (CREE INC [US]) [Y] 1,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]US2008191235 (WANG BILY [TW], et al) [Y] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]US2008285270 (CHIANG CHENG-LIEN [TW]) [Y] 1,7 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003168720 (KAMADA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004256706 (NAKASHIMA SHINTARO [JP]) [Y] 3,10 * abstract *; | [A]US2006049420 (LIU CHIA C [TW]) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figures 2A,2B *; | [A]US2008013319 (PEI CHIEN-CHANG [TW], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2008246397 (WANG BILY [TW], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0033]; figures 1,3-6 * | Examination | US2008012036 |