EP2336409 - Coated nanocrystal and method of preparing a coated nanocrystal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/25] | Method of preparing a coated nanocrystal | ||
[2022/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge MA 02142 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Sungjee 1200 E California Boulevard 128-95 Caltech Pasadena, California 91125 / US | 02 /
Bawendi, Moungi G. 17 Lowell Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2023/19] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Kim, Sungjee 1200 E California Boulevard 128-95 Caltech Pasadena, California 91125 / US | ||
02 /
Bawendi, Moungi G. 17 Lowell Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/19] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10188259.5 | 12.08.2003 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20020402726P | 13.08.2002 Original published format: US 402726 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2336409 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2336409 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336409 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34, H01L31/00, C09K11/00, C30B29/60, C30B7/00, B82Y15/00, G01N33/58, H01L21/02, H01L29/267, H01L51/42, H01L29/06, H01L29/165, H01L29/205, C30B33/00, C09K11/88, B82Y10/00, B82Y20/00, B82Y30/00, H01L29/225 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/588 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09K11/883 (EP,US);
C30B29/605 (EP,US);
C30B33/00 (EP,US);
C30B7/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02409 (EP,US);
H01L21/02411 (EP,US);
H01L21/02521 (EP,US);
H01L21/0256 (EP,US);
H01L21/02562 (EP,US);
H01L21/02601 (EP,US);
H01L29/0665 (EP,US);
H01L29/0673 (EP,US);
H01L29/165 (EP,US);
H01L29/205 (EP,US);
H01L29/225 (EP,US);
H01L29/267 (EP,US);
H10K30/35 (US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y10S977/773 (EP,US);
Y10S977/774 (EP,US);
Y10S977/777 (EP,US);
Y10S977/811 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12021 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12528 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12986 (EP,US);
Y10T428/294 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/315 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | D02G3/00, G09G3/34, G01N33/543, H01L31/00, C09K11/00, C30B29/60, C30B29/48, C30B7/00, B82Y15/00, G01N33/58 | ||
Former IPC [2011/25] | D02G3/00, G09G3/34, G01N33/543, H01L31/00, C09K11/00, C30B29/60, C30B29/48, C30B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2011/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beschichteter Nanokristall und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines beschichteten Nanokristalles | [2022/51] | English: | Coated nanocrystal and method of preparing a coated nanocrystal | [2022/51] | French: | Nanocristal revêtu et procédé de préparation d'un nanocristal revêtu | [2022/51] |
Former [2011/25] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines beschichteten Nanokristalles | ||
Former [2011/25] | Method of preparing a coated nanocrystal | ||
Former [2011/25] | Procédé de préparation d'un nanocristal revêtu | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Request for decision received: Claims | 31.03.2011 | Result of request for decision (Claims): Request accepted | 02.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 04.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2022 | 22.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03810871.8 / EP1537263 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030810871) is 11.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | GB | 11.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | CZ | 12.08.2023 | IE | 12.08.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
GB | 11.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
GB | 11.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
GB | 11.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
GB | 11.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
IE | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001040232 (BAWENDI MOUNGI G [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]WO0225745 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002071952 (BAWENDI MOUNGI [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0015]; claims 1,17,18 *; | [X]US6423551 (WEISS SHIMON [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,5,10 *; | [A] - MIKULEC F V, "SYNTHESIS ANDCHARACTERIZATIONS OF HIGHLY LUMINESCENT(CDSE)ZNS QUANTUM DOTS", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, PITTSBURG, PA, (19970101), vol. 452, ISSN 0272-9172, pages 359 - 364, XP002095419 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | - A. D. Yoffe, "Semiconductor quantum dots and related systems: Electronic, optical, luminescence and related properties of low dimensional systems", ADVANCES IN PHYSICS., GB, (20010101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1080/00018730010006608, ISSN 0001-8732, pages 1 - 208, XP055245472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00018730010006608 | by applicant | US6322901 | US6576291 | - MURRAY, C.B. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, page 8706 | - PENG, X. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, page 7019 | - DABBOUSI, B.O. ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (1997), vol. 101, page 9463 | - CAO, Y.W.; BANIN, U., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. EDIT., (1999), vol. 38, page 3692 | - SUZUKI, K. ET AL., J. APPL. PHYS., (1999), vol. 85, page 8349 | - SCHITTENHELM, P. ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1995), vol. 67, page 1292 | - HAUS, J.W. ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (1993), vol. 47, page 1359 | - SCHOOSS, D. ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (1994), vol. 49, page 49 | - YAKIMOV, A.I. ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (2001), vol. 63, page 045312 | - CAO, Y. W.; BANIN U., ANGEW. CHERH. INT. EDIT., (1999), vol. 38, page 3692 | - LAHELD, U.E.H. ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (1995), vol. 52, page 2697 | - RORRISON, J.M., PHYS. REV B, (1993), vol. 48, page 4643 | - MURRAY ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, page 8706 | US20020402726 |