EP2278848 - Transmitting device, receiving device and method for establishing a wireless communication link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uno, Masahiro 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Wang, Zhaocheng c/o Sony Deutschland GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Str. 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
Uno, Masahiro 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
Wang, Zhaocheng c/o Sony Deutschland GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Str. 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Uno, Masahiro c/o Sony Deutschland GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Str.61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Wang, Zhaocheng c/o Sony Deutschland GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Str. 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188382.5 | 09.10.2006 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278848 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2278848 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, // H04W16/28, H04W72/08, H04W84/18 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/54 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | H04W76/02, // H04W16/28 | ||
Former IPC [2011/04] | H04W76/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/04] | Title | German: | Sendeeinrichtung, Empfangseinrichtung und Verfahren zum Einrichten einer drahtlosen Kommunikationsverbindung | [2011/04] | English: | Transmitting device, receiving device and method for establishing a wireless communication link | [2011/04] | French: | Dispositif émetteur, dispositif récepteur et procédé pour l'établissement d'une liaison de communication sans fil | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06021152.1 / EP1912454 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060021152) is 28.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08271561 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]WO9825362 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]WO0038452 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]US2006040675 (HALFMANN RUDIGER [DE], et al) |