EP2314970 - layered heat storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/17] | Layered heat storage | ||
[2018/30] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluesol GmbH Untere Gasse 35 7012 Felsberg / CH | [2019/02] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Ramani, Dritan Untere Gasse 35 7012 Felsberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMANI, Dritan Untere Gasse 35 7012 Felsberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hasler, Erich c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Hasler, Erich Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 10188887.3 | 26.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | CH20090001635 | 26.10.2009 Original published format: CH 16352009 | CH20090001987 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: CH 19872009 | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314970 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
F28D20/0039 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0069 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0078 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0086 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Thermischer Schichtspeicher | [2011/17] | English: | layered heat storage | [2018/30] | French: | stockage de chaleur étagé | [2018/30] |
Former [2011/17] | Layered heat storage | ||
Former [2011/17] | Stockage de chaleur étagé | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]ATA507075 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]); | [XI]CH682178 (CIPAG S A FABRIQUE DE CHAUDIER [CH]); | [XI]DE29612894U (SOLAR DIAMANT SYSTEMTECHNIK UN [DE]); | [A]DE19608405 (MILLER BERNHARD [DE]); | [XYI]DE19743563 (SAUTER ALOIS [DE]); | [Y]DE29920954U (BRUNS GMBH GEB [DE]); | [X]DE202005006282U (ROHNER ANDREAS [DE]); | [XI]EP2031333 (CECCHIN PIETRO [IT]) | by applicant | DE19743563 | DE29920954U | DE20220554U |