EP2447676 - Method for producing a magnetic linear scale [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bogen Electronic GmbH Potsdamer Strasse 12-13 14163 Berlin / DE | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Elbel, Michaela PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 33 07 11 80067 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Elbel, Michaela PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Altheimer Eck 13 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Elbel, Michaela Pateris Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Altheimer Eck 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188909.5 | 26.10.2010 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447676 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447676 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/249, G01D5/244 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G01D5/24438 (EP);
G01D5/2495 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2012/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines magnetischen Linearmassstabs | [2012/18] | English: | Method for producing a magnetic linear scale | [2012/18] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une échelle linéaire magnétique | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 18.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2010 | AL | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | GR | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | IE | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LU | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | MT | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | GB | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 26.10.2016 | |
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 31.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1006342 (SCHNEEBERGER HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2a,2b,3; claims 1-3,6,8 * [A] 4; | [YA]WO03011733 (INVENTIO AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - page 7, line 15; figures 1-3,5,6 * * page 11, line 13 - page 15, line 5 * [A] 4; | [YA]DE20302273U (BERNSTEIN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 31; figures 1-3 *[A] 4; | [YA]DE102005049559 (BOGEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0043]; claims 1-5, 12-14 * [A] 4 |