EP2365509 - Electrostatic relay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Takahiro c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Junya c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/37] | Wilhelms · Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Straße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10189070.5 | 27.10.2010 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | JP20100055556 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010055556 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365509 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365509 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01H59/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
H01H45/14 (US);
H01H59/0009 (EP,US);
H01H2001/0078 (EP,US);
H01H2221/036 (US);
H01H2235/02 (US);
H01H2239/008 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | Elektrostatisches Relais | [2011/37] | English: | Electrostatic relay | [2011/37] | French: | Relais électrostatique | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 05.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2010 | AL | 25.02.2015 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | GB | 27.10.2015 | IE | 27.10.2015 | LU | 27.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 27.10.2010 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 27.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 27.10.2010 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 27.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 27.10.2010 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 27.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 27.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009261517 (YAO JUN JASON [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 0020 - page 6, paragraph 0054; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2009260960 (GRITTERS JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 10, paragraph 0107 - page 12, paragraph 0120; figures 17,18 *; | [X]DE102006001321 (PROTRON MIKROTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 5, paragraph 0043 - page 6, paragraph 0054; figures 1a,2a,3a,3b *; | [A]DE102007035633 (PROTRON MIKROTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 6, paragraph 0043 - page 7, paragraph 0045; figure 3 * | by applicant | JPH06203726 | JP2000164104 |