EP2296325 - Route selection in wireless networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Hang c/o TECHNICOLOR 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | [2014/18] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Liu, Hang c/o TECHNICOLOR 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | Representative(s) | Lorette, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Lorette, Anne Technicolor 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2011/11] | Lorette, Anne Technicolor 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 10189229.7 | 09.11.2005 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2296325 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2296325 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2296325 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/70 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
H04L45/26 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04W40/28 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
H04L45/02 (US);
H04L45/32 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04W40/023 (KR);
H04W40/248 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | H04L12/56, H04W40/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | ROUTENAUSWAHL IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZEN | [2011/21] | English: | Route selection in wireless networks | [2011/11] | French: | Sélection d'un chemin dans des réseaux sans fil | [2011/11] |
Former [2011/11] | Routenauswahl in drahtlosen Netzen | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05824653.9 / EP1952588 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050824653) is 29.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | IE | 09.11.2014 | LU | 09.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2015/46] |
Former [2015/36] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | BE | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO0141375 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO0195641 (CALY CORP [US]); | [XA]EP1467524 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); |