EP2282270 - XML printer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIH Corp. 3 Overlook Point Lincolnshire, IL 60069 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states ZIH Corp. 1201 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alleshouse, Bruce, N. 1426 Forest Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091-1634 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Alleshouse, Bruce, N. 1426 Forest Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091-1634 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/06] | Schinkel, Reta, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10189303.0 | 13.11.2002 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US20010341427P | 17.12.2001 Original published format: US 341427 P | US20020345389P | 04.01.2002 Original published format: US 345389 P | US20020197014 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: US 197014 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282270 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2282270 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282270 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G06K1/12 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/1206 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F3/1246 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
G06K1/121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/06] | G06F17/00, G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2011/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | XML-Druckersystem | [2011/06] | English: | XML printer system | [2011/06] | French: | Systeme d'impression XML | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2017 | 18.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02789602.6 / EP1456790 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020789602) is 31.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | IE | 13.11.2018 | LU | 13.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0106345 (FARGO ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 20 * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 8 * * page 16, line 15 - page 25, line 29 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A] - SCHNEIDER B, "Dynamic Web Presentation with JAVA and XSLT", INTERNET CITATION, (20010605), URL: http://www.eveandersson.com/arsdigita/asj/xslt/, (20061122), XP002408527 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3 * | by applicant | US5372439 |