EP2447446 - Device for fastening tension members to reinforced concrete beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berset, Thierry Brühlgartenstrasse 10 8400, Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Bänziger, Heinz Chlosterwis 15 8427, Freienstein / CH | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16-22 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10189323.8 | 28.10.2010 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447446 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/02 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
E04G23/0218 (EP,US);
E04G2023/0255 (EP,US);
E04G2023/0259 (EP,US);
E04G2023/0262 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49632 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Endverankerung von Zuggliedern an Stahlbetonträgern | [2012/18] | English: | Device for fastening tension members to reinforced concrete beams | [2012/18] | French: | Ancrage terminal d'éléments de traction sur des supports en béton armé | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5479748 (SILLER JOSE L [MX]) [X] 1,3,9 * figure 1 * [I] 2,4-8,10-15; | [XI]US5671572 (SILLER-FRANCO JOSE LUIS [MX]) [X] 1,3,9 * figure - * [I] 2,4-8,10-15; | [X]JP2000129929 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP, et al) [X] 1,4,11 * figure 3 *; | [X]JP2002364185 (FAIBEKKUSU KK) [X] 1,4,11 * figure 6 *; | [A]EP1033455 (FREYSSINET INT STUP [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 6-10 * | by applicant | WO2004038128 | WO0216710 | DE19944573 | EP20100173179 |