EP2320283 - Integrated optimization and control for production plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sayyar-Rodsari, Bijan 6800 Rustling Oaks Trail Austin, TX 78759 / US | 02 /
Schweiger, Carl Anthony 9003 Frazell Cove Round Rock, TX 78681 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10189335.2 | 29.10.2010 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | US20090609785 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: US 609785 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320283 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/04 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
G05B13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Integrierte Optimierung und Steuerung für Fertigungsanlagen | [2011/19] | English: | Integrated optimization and control for production plants | [2011/19] | French: | Optimisation intégrée et contrôle d'usines de production | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6434435 (TUBEL PAULO S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 67 * * column 4, line 5 - line 44 * * column 6, line 41 - column 10, line 43 * * column 12, line 45 - column 13, line 6 * * column 17, line 1 - column 18, line 42 * * figures 1,11,13,15 *; | [XI]US2007156288 (WROBLEWSKI DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,13,15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0136] * * figures 3-8 * [I] 7,8,12,14; | [A]US2008108048 (BARTEE JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9,14,15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0147] ** figures 7,8 * | Examination | US2005187643 | by applicant | US2005187643 |