EP2320564 - Circuit and method for adjusting the phase of a signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Mommsenstrasse 13 01069 Dresden / DE | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Uwe Gohliser Strasse 18 01159 Dresden / DE | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 10189363.4 | 29.10.2010 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | EP20090174615 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: EP 09174615 | [2011/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2320564 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2320564 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/20, H03H11/04 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H03H11/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | H03H11/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaltung und Verfahren zur Einstellung einer Phase eines Signals | [2011/19] | English: | Circuit and method for adjusting the phase of a signal | [2011/19] | French: | Circuit et procédé de réglage d'une phase d'un signal | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4232399 (HEITER GEORGE L) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US4297641 (STERZER FRED) [X] 5 * figure 3 * [Y] 6; | [YA] - MAYER U ET AL, "Compact circulator based phase shifter at C-band in BiCMOS", RADIO FREQUENCY INTEGRATED CIRCUITS SYMPOSIUM, 2009. RFIC 2009. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090607), ISBN 978-1-4244-3377-3, pages 499 - 502, XP031480325 [Y] 6 * Section V;; figure 3 * [A] 1-4 | [A] - YOU ZHENG ET AL, "An Ultra-Compact CMOS Variable Phase Shifter for 2.4-GHz ISM Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080601), vol. 56, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 1349 - 1354, XP011214233 [A] 1-6 * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | - F. ELLINGER; H. JäCKEL; W. BäCHTOLD, "Varactor-loaded transmission-line phase shifter at C-band using lumped elements", IEEE TRANS. MICROWAVE THEORY & TECH., (200304), vol. 51, pages 1135 - 1140 | - C. LU; A.H. PHAM; D. LIVEZEY, "On the feasibility of CMOS multiband phase shifters for multiple-antenna transmitters", IEEE MICROWAVE AND WIRELESS COMPONENTS LETTERS, (200605), vol. 16, pages 255 - 257 | - ODER J. WAGNER; U. MAYER; F. ELLINGER, "Passive transmission line phase shifter at C-band in CMOS using lumped elements", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICROWAVES, RADAR AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION, (20080504), page 1 | - S. LUCYSZYN; I. D. ROBERTSON, "Decade bandwidth MMIC analogue phase shifter", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON MULTI-OCTAVE MICROWAVE CIRCUITS, (19911106), pages 2,1 - 2 | - H. HAYASHI; M. MURAGUCHI, "An MMIC active phase shifter using a variable resonant circuit", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, (199806), vol. 3, pages 1573 - 1576 | - Y. ZHENG; C. E. SAAVEDRA, "An ultra-compact CMOS variable phase shifter for 2.4-GHz ISM applications", IEEE TRANS. MICROWAVE THEORY & TECH., (200806), vol. 56, no. 6, pages 1349 - 1354 |