EP2320028 - Steampath flow separation reduction system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanchez, Nestor Hernandez 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/19] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10189572.0 | 01.11.2010 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | US20090612854 | 05.11.2009 Original published format: US 612854 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2320028 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2320028 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D9/04, F01D25/24 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F05D2270/17 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | F01D5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Verringerung der Dampfströmungsablösung | [2011/19] | English: | Steampath flow separation reduction system | [2011/19] | French: | Système de réduction de la séparation d'un flux de vapeur | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS588203 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract *; | [X]JPH03107504 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7* abstract *; | [X]DE19524984 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 1 - line 4 * * figure - *; | [X]EP1780381 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2009110550 (TANI KENTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * figure - * |