EP2354253 - Method for non-invasive prenatal diagnosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trustees of Boston University One Silber Way Boston, MA 02215 / US | For all designated states The Chinese University Of Hong Kong Shatin N.T. Hong Kong / CN | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cantor, Charles R. 526 Stratford Court Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
Ding, Chunming Block 13 Dover Close East 19-216 / SG | 03 /
Lo, Yuk Ming Dennis 4th Floor, 7 King Tak Street Homantin, Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
Chiu, Rossa Wai-Kwun Fl. 1A Bl. 1 Constellation Cove 1 Hung Lam Drive Tai Po, N.T., Hong Kong / CN | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10189690.0 | 07.09.2004 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | US20030500526P | 05.09.2003 Original published format: US 500526 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2354253 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2354253 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6872 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6872, C12Q2535/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NICHTINVASIVEN PRÄNATALEN DIAGNOSE | [2011/46] | English: | Method for non-invasive prenatal diagnosis | [2011/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC PRENATAL NON EFFRACTIF | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/32] | Verfahren zur nichtinvasiven pränatalen Diagnose | ||
Former [2011/32] | Procede de diagnostic prenatal non effractif | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 30.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04783186.2 / EP1664077 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040783186) is 12.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0175163 (POLYGENYX INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * page 4, line 3 - line 5 * * page 22, line 5 - line 6 *; | [A] - TANG K ET AL, "Chip-based genotyping by mass spectrometry.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 31 AUG 1999, (19990831), vol. 96, no. 18, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10016 - 10020, XP002447905 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.18.10016 | [Y] - CHIU ROSSA W K ET AL, "Prenatal exclusion of beta thalassaemia major by examination of maternal plasma.", LANCET 28 SEP 2002 LNKD- PUBMED:12383672, (20020928), vol. 360, no. 9338, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 998 - 1000, XP002640067 [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - KUKRETI RITUSHREE ET AL, "Study of the single nucleotide polymorphism (SNP) at the palindromic sequence of hypersensitive site (HS)4 of the human beta-globin locus control region (LCR) in Indian population.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY JAN 2002 LNKD- PUBMED:11835338, (200201), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0361-8609, pages 77 - 79, XP002640068 [Y] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/AJH.10026 | by applicant | US6013431 | US4843155 | US5346994 | US6355433 | US6210891 | US6458535 | - LO, Y.M.D. ET AL., LANCET, (1997), vol. 350, pages 485 - 487 | - LO, Y.M.D. ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (1998), vol. 62, pages 768 - 775 | - COSTA, JM.; BENACHI, A.; GAUTIER, E., NENGL JMED, (2002), vol. 346, page 1502 | - LO, Y.M.D. ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1998), vol. 339, pages 1734 - 1738 | - CHIU, R.W.K.; LO, Y.M.D., EXPERT REV MOL DIAGN, (2002), vol. 2, pages 32 - 40 | - SEKIZAWA, A.; KONDO, T.; IWASAKI, M.; WATANABE, A.; JIMBO, M.; SAITO, H.; OKAI, T., CLIN. CHEM., (2001), vol. 47, pages 1856 - 1858 | - FINNING, K. M.; MARTIN, P. G.; SOOTHILL, P. W.; AVENT, N. D., TRANSFUSION, (2002), vol. 42, pages 1079 - 1085 | - COSTA, J. M.; BENACHI, A.; GAUTIER, E.; JOUANNIC, J. M.; ERNAULT, P.; DUMEZ, Y., PRENATAL DIAGN., (2001), vol. 21, pages 1070 - 1074 | - RIJNDERS, R. J.; CHRISTIAENS, G. C.; BOSSERS, B.; SMAGT, J. J.; DER SCHOOT, C. E.; HAAS, M., OBSTET. GYNECOL., (2004), vol. 103, pages 157 - 164 | - LO Y ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 62, pages 768 - 775 | - HEID ET AL., GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994 | - NASIS, 0.; THOMPSON, S.; HONG, T.; SHERWOOD, M.; RADCLIFFE, S.; JACKSON, L.; OTEVREL, T., CLIN. CHEM, (2004), vol. 50, pages 694 - 701 | - NASIS, O.; THOMPSON, S.; HONG, T.; SHERWOOD, M.; RADCLIFFE, S.; JACKSON, L.; OTEVREL, T., CLIN. CHEM., (2004), vol. 50, pages 694 - 701 | - SAITO, H.; SEKIZAWA, A.; MORIMOTO, T.; SUZUKI, M.; YANAIHARA, T., LANCET, (2000), vol. 356, page 1170 | - GONZALEZ-GONZALEZ, M. C.; TRUJILLO, M. J.; RODRIGUEZ DE ALBA, M.; RAMOS, C., NEUROLOGY, (2003), vol. 60, pages 1214 - 1215 | - GONZALEZ-GONZALEZ, M. C.; GARCIA-HOYOS, M.; TRUJILLO, M. J.; RODRIGUEZ DE ALBA, M.; LORDA-SANCHEZ, 1.; DIAZ-RECASENS, J.; GALLARDO, PRENATAL DIAGN., (2002), vol. 22, pages 946 - 948 | - FUCHAROEN, G.; TUNGWIWAT, W.; RATANASIRI, T.; SANCHAISURIYA, K.; FUCHAROEN, S., PRENATAL DIAGN., (2003), vol. 23, pages 393 - 396 | - LO, Y. M. D., J. PATHOL., (1994), vol. 174, pages 1 - 6 | - CHIU, R.W.K. ET AL., CLIN CHEM, (2002), vol. 48, pages 778 - 780 | - WEATHERALL, D.J.; CLEGG, J.B., BULL WORLD HEALTH ORGAN, (2001), vol. 79, pages 704 - 712 | - WEATHERALL, D. J., BMJ314, (1997), pages 1675 - 1678 | - "The hemoglobinopathies", WEATHERALL ET AL., The Metabolic and Molecular Bases of Inherited Disease, MCGRAW-HILL, (1995), pages 3417 - 3484 | - MODEL ET AL., "Survival in beta-thalassaemia major in the UK: data from the UK Thalassaemia Register", LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, pages 2051 - 2052 | - STEINBERG, M. H.; ADAMS, J. G., "Thalassemia: recent insights into molecular mechanisms", AN2. J HEMAT, (1982), vol. 12, pages 81 - 92 | - CHEUNG, M.C.; GOLDBERG, J.D.; KAN, Y.W., NAT GENET, (1996), vol. 14, pages 264 - 268 | - CHIU, R.W.K. ET AL., LANCET, (2002), vol. 360, pages 998 - 1000 | - TANG, K. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 10016 - 10020 | - LO ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (1998), vol. 62, pages 768 - 775 | - DING; CANTOR, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2003), vol. 100, pages 7449 - 7453 | - SUOMALAINEN ET AL., MOL. BIOTECHNOL. JUN, (2000), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 123 - 31 | - CHIU, R.W.K. ET AL., CLIN CHEM, (2001), vol. 47, pages 1607 - 1613 | - SHALON ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 639 - 45 | - BERNARD ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 1435 - 42 | - DORIS ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR, (1998), vol. 806, no. 1, pages 47 - 60 | - HOLLAND ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7276 - 7280 | - TECHNOTES, (200102), vol. 8, no. 1 | - HULTMAN ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1988), vol. 17, pages 4937 - 4946 | - SYVANEN ET AL., GENOMICS, (1990), vol. 8, pages 684 - 692 | - MOL BIOTECHNOL, (200006), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 123 - 131 | - DING, C; CANTOR, C.R., PROC NAIL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 7449 - 7453 | - TANG K. ET AL., PROE NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 10016 - 10020 | - CHIU, R.W.K ET AL., CLIN CHEM, (2002), vol. 48, pages 778 - 780 | - DING, C.; CANTOR, C.R., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 7449 - 7453 | - LAU, Y.L. ET AL., NENGL J MED, (1997), vol. 336, pages 1298 - 1301 | - ANKER, P. ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 112, pages 1114 - 1120 | - LO, Y.M.D. ET AL., LANCET, (1998), vol. 351, pages 1329 - 1330 | - NG, I. S.; ONG, J. B.; TAN, C. L.; LAW, H. Y., HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 94, pages 385 - 388 | - SANGUANSERMSRI, T.; THANARATTANALCORN, P.; STEGER, H. F.; TONGSONG, T.; CHANPRAPAPH, P.; WANPIRAK, C.; SIRIWATANAPA, P.; SIRICHOTI, HEMOGLOBIN, (2001), vol. 25, pages 19 - 27 | - CHIU, R. W. K.; POON, L. L. M.; LAU, T. K.; LEUNG, T. N.; WONG, E. M. C.; LO, Y. M. D, CLIN. CHEM., (2001), vol. 47, pages 1607 - 1613 | - TANG, K.; FU, D. J.; JULIEN, D.; BRAUN, A.; CANTOR, C. R.; KOSTER, H., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 10016 - 10020 | - DING, C.; CANTOR, C. R., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 7449 - 7453 | - LAU, Y. L.; CHAN, L. C.; CHAN, Y. Y.; HA, S. Y.; YEUNG, C. Y.; WAYE, J. S.; CHUI, D. H., N. ENGL. J MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 1298 - 1301 | - LIANG, R.; LIANG, S.; JIANG, N. H.; WEN, X. J.; ZHAO, J. B.; NECHTMAN, J. F.; STOMING, T. A.; HUISMAN, T. H., BR. J HAEMATOL., (1994), vol. 86, pages 351 - 354 | - NASIS, 0.; THOMPSON, S.; HONG, T.; SHERWOOD, M.; RADCLIFFE, S.; JACKSON, L.; OTEVREL, T., CLIN. CHEM., (2004), vol. 50, pages 694 - 701 | - SCHOOL, C. E.; TAX, G. H.; RIJNDERS, R. J.; HAAS, M.; CHRISTIAENS, G. C., TRANSFUSION MED. REV., (2003), vol. 17, pages 31 - 44 | - ZHONG, X. Y.; HOLZGREVE, W.; HAHN, S., SWISS MED. WKLY., (2001), vol. 131, pages 70 - 74 | - AVENT, N. D.; FINNING, K. M.; MARTIN, P. G.; SOOTHILL, P. W., VOX SANGUINIS, (2000), vol. 78, pages 155 - 162 | - SCHOOT, C. E.; TAX, G. H.; RIJNDERS, R. J.; HAAS, M.; CHRISTIAENS, G. C., TRANSFUSION MED. REV., (2003), vol. 17, pages 31 - 44 | - AVENT, N. D.; FINNING, K. M.; MARTIN, P. G.; SOOTHILL, P. W., VOX SANAGUINIS, (2000), vol. 78, pages 155 - 162 | - CHIU, R. W. K.; LAU, T. K.; LEUNG, T. N.; CHOW, K. C. K.; CHUI, D. H. K.; LO, Y. M. D., LANCET, (2002), vol. 360, pages 998 - 1000 | - CHIU, R. W. K.; LAU, T. K.; CHEUNG, P. T.; GONG, Z. Q.; LEUNG, T. N.; LO, Y. M. D., CLIN. CHEM., (2002), vol. 48, pages 778 - 780 | - BIANCHI, D. W., CLIN. CHEM., (2002), vol. 48, pages 689 - 690 | - LAU, Y. L.; CHAN, L. C.; CHAN, Y. Y.; HA, S. Y.; YEUNG, C. Y.; WAYE, J. S.; CHUI, D. H., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 1298 - 1301 | - LIANG, R.; LIANG, S.; JIANG, N. H.; WEN, X. J.; ZHAO, J. B.; NECHTMAN, J. F.; STOMING, T. A.; HUISMAN, T. H., BR. J. HAEMATOL, (1994), vol. 86, pages 351 - 354 | - DING, C.; CANTOR, C. R., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 3059 - 3064 | - LO, Y. M. D.; LAU, T. K.; ZHANG, J.; LEUNG, T. N.; CHANG, A. M.; HJELM, N. M.; ELMES, R. S.; BIANCHI, D. W., CLIN. CHEM., (1999), vol. 45, pages 1747 - 1751 | - ZHONG, X. Y.; BURK, M. R.; TROEGER, C.; JACKSON, L. R.; HOLZGREVE, W.; HAHN, S., PRENATAL DIAGN., (2000), vol. 20, pages 795 - 798 | - LO, Y. M. D.; LEUNG, T. N.; TEIN, M. S.; SARGENT, 1. L.; ZHANG, J.; LAU, T. K.; HAINES, C. J.; REDMAN, C. W., CLIN. CHEM., (1999), vol. 45, pages 184 - 188 | - ZHONG, X. Y.; LAIVUORI, H.; LIVINGSTON, J. C.; YLIKORKALA, O.; SIBAI, B. M.; HOLZGREVE, W.; HALM, S., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (2001), vol. 184, pages 414 - 419 | - LEUNG, T. N.; ZHANG, J.; LAU, T. K.; HJELM, N. M.; LO, Y. M. D., LANCET, (1998), vol. 352, pages 1904 - 1905 | - BOTEZATU, I.; SERDYUK, O.; POTAPOVA, G.; SHELEPOV, V.; ALECHINA, R.; MOLYAKA, Y.; ANANEV, V.; BAZIN, I.; GARIN, A.; NARIMANOV, M., CLIN. CHEM., (2000), vol. 46, pages 1078 - 1084 | - ANGERT, R. M.; LESHANE, E. S.; YARNELL, R. W.; JOHNSON, K. L.; BIANCHI, D. W., AIN. J. OBSTET. GVNECOL., (2004), vol. 190, pages 1087 - 1090 | - BIANCHI, D. W.; ROMERO, R., J. MATERNAL FETAL NEONATAL MED., (2003), vol. 14, pages 123 - 129 | - NELSON, J. L., LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, pages 2011 - 2012 | - LO, Y. M. D.; LO, E. S.; WATSON, N.; NOAKES, L.; SARGENT, I. L.; THILAGANATHAN, B.; WAINSCOAT, J. S., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 88, pages 4390 - 4395 | - LO, Y. M. D.; PATEL, P.; WAINSCOAT, J. S.; SAMPIETRO, M.; GILLMER, M. D.; FLEMING, K. A., LANCET, (1989), vol. 2, pages 1363 - 1365 | - LO, Y. M. D.; PATEL, P.; WAINSCOAT, J. S.; FLEMING, K. A., LANCET, (1990), vol. 335, page 724 | - LO, Y. M. D.; CHAN, L. Y. S.; LO, K. W.; LEUNG, S. F.; ZHANG, J.; CHAN, A. T. C.; LEE, J. C.; HJELM, N. M.; JOHNSON, P. J.; HUANG,, CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 1188 - 1191 | - ANKER, P.; LEFORT, F.; VASIOUKHIN, V.; LYAUTEY, J.; LEDERREY, C.; CHEN, X. Q.; STROUN, M.; MULCAHY, H. E.; FARTHING, M. J., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 112, pages 1114 - 1120 | - SORENSON, G. D., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (2000), vol. 906, pages 13 - 16 | - LO, Y. M. D.; TEIN, M. S.; PANG, C. C.; YEUNG, C. K.; TONG, K. L.; HJELM, N. M., LANCET, (1998), vol. 351, pages 1329 - 1330 | US20030500526 |