EP2333677 - System for cinema exhibition management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datasat Technologies AG Industriestrasse 7 Postfach 6301 Zug / CH | [2012/04] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Datasat Digital Entertainment, Inc. 9631 Topanga Canyon Place Chatsworth CA 91311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reich, Jason, Sperling 23650 Park Belmonte Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | 02 /
Le, Luan 1223 Roberta Avenue Fullerton, CA 92833 / US | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Reich, Jason, Sperling 2222 N. Beachwood Drive, 415 Los Angeles, CA 90068 / US | ||
02 /
Le, Luan 1223 Roberta Avenue Fullerton, CA 92833 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10190224.5 | 07.03.2008 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | US20070905932P | 09.03.2007 Original published format: US 905932 P | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333677 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q50/00, G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q10/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung von Kinovorführungen | [2011/24] | English: | System for cinema exhibition management | [2011/24] | French: | Système pour la gestion des séances de cinéma | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08726689.6 / EP2137575 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2011 | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates inter alia to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art. 52(2) and (3) EPC. The Applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. Accordingly, no documentary evidence is considered required, as the technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of the common general knowledge. For further details see the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 (OJ 11/2007; p592-593) and the accompanying opinion.The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates inter alia to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art. 52(2) and (3) EPC. The Applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. Accordingly, no documentary evidence is considered required, as the technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of the common general knowledge. For further details see the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 (OJ 11/2007; p592-593) and the accompanying opinion. [X] 1-12 | by applicant | US20070905932 |