EP2333298 - Electromagnetic injector control valve or pressure regulator valve for a high pressure fuel accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leister, Jens Alexanderstrasse 12 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
Beier, Marco Bertastrasse 31 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | 03 /
Rochas, Pierre-Marie 4 rue Etienne Gagnaire 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 04 /
Rain, Oliver Hauffstrasse 24 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Leister, Jens Alexanderstrasse 12 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | ||
02 /
Beier, Marco Bertastrasse 31 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | |||
03 /
Rochas, Pierre-Marie 4 rue Etienne Gagnaire 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | |||
04 /
Rain, Oliver Hauffstrasse 24 71229 Leonberg / DE | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Cabinet HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/24] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 10190332.6 | 08.11.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | FR20090005823 | 02.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0905823 | [2011/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333298 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333298 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M61/16, F02M63/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
F02M51/061 (EP,US);
F02M61/166 (EP,US);
F02M63/0015 (EP,US);
F02M63/007 (EP,US);
F02M63/0075 (EP,US);
F02M2200/07 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Steuerventil eines Injektors oder zur Druckregulierung eines Hochdruckkraftstoffakkumulators | [2011/24] | English: | Electromagnetic injector control valve or pressure regulator valve for a high pressure fuel accumulator | [2011/24] | French: | Soupape électromagnétique de commande d'un injecteur ou de régulation de pression d'un accumulateur de carburant à haute pression. | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 05.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2010 | AL | 31.10.2012 | AT | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | RS | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | IE | 08.11.2012 | LU | 08.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 08.11.2010 | |
AL | 31.10.2012 | ||
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.11.2012 | ||
LU | 08.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 31.10.2012 | |
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.11.2012 | ||
LU | 08.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 31.10.2012 | |
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AL | 31.10.2012 | |
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 31.10.2012 | |
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1967726 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, paragraph 0020; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19938865 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]EP2112366 (MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN SPA [IT]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, paragraph 0022; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE102008001122 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19832826 | US5295627 | DE10131199 |