Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8808678 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2014 | B2 | US2014047653 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | US201314036000 | 25.09.2013 | US60127706 | 17.11.2006 | US201113094089 | 26.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8568702 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2011197382 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | US60127706 | 17.11.2006 | US201113094089 | 26.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007110699 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | US60127706 | 17.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4903216B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B2 | JP2009515636 | 16.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB54324 | 17.11.2006 | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1948702 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB54324 | 17.11.2006 | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2287214 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2012 | B1 | EP2287214 | 23.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | EP06821491 | 17.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2629687 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB54324 | 17.11.2006 | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101321788B | 08.02.2012 | B | CN101321788 | 10.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB54324 | 17.11.2006 | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007057865 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2007 | A3 | WO2007057865 | 24.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010235958 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102604752B | 28.01.2015 | B | CN102604752 | 25.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US73782205 | 17.11.2005 | Type | Earlier application | EP1948702 |