EP2330495 - Improvements in or relating to optical navigation devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Research & Development) Limited Planar House, Parkway, Globe Park Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reigneau, Mathieu 124 rue du Marchais Muraille 45200, Amilly / FR | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Hayden, Nicholas Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Hayden, Nicholas Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10190508.1 | 09.11.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | GB20090019731 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: GB 0919731 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2330495 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/042 (EP,GB,US);
G06F3/0304 (GB);
G06F2203/04109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbesserungen der oder im Zusammenhang mit optischen Navigationsgeräten | [2011/23] | English: | Improvements in or relating to optical navigation devices | [2011/23] | French: | Améliorations de ou associées aux dispositifs de navigation optiques | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | GB20090008899 |