EP2287624 - Scanning Probe System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation 45 Glover Avenue P.O. Box 4505 Norwalk, CT 06856-4505 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hantschel, Thomas 3485 Alameda de las Pulgas, Nr. 6 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
Chow, Eugene M. 40434 La Jolla Court Fremont, California 94539 / US | 03 /
Fork, David 1993 Farndon Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10190901.8 | 31.03.2003 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US20020112215 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 112215 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2287624 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2287624 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q70/06, G01Q70/10, G01Q70/16 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G01Q70/10 (EP,US);
G01Q70/06 (EP,US);
G01Q70/16 (EP,US);
G01R1/06727 (EP);
Y10S977/873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2011/08] | Title | German: | Rastersondenvorrichtung mit Federsonde | [2011/08] | English: | Scanning Probe System | [2011/08] | French: | Systeme de sonde à balayage avec une sonde élastyque | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03007302.7 / EP1351256 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030007302) is 04.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH1138022 (MITUTOYO CORP) [X] 1-6,9-12,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * [Y] 13 [I] 7,8; | [Y]WO9721105 (NAM JAE WOO [KR]) [Y] 13 * figure 10 * | by applicant | US3842189 | US5613861 | - IBM J. RES. DEV., (19980905), vol. 42, no. 5, page 655 | US20000233276 |