EP2323450 - Apparatus and method for controlling uplink transmission power in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Jeong-Ho c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do, Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
Cho, Jae-Hee c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do, Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
Yu, Hyun-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do, Suwon-si / KR | [2020/37] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Park, Jeong-Ho c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do, Suwon-si / KR | ||
02 /
Cho, Jae-Hee c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do, Suwon-si / KR | |||
03 /
Yu, Hyun-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do, Suwon-si / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/20] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10191074.3 | 12.11.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | KR20090110016 | 14.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090110016 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2323450 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2323450 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323450 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/12, H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04W52/08, H04W52/10 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H04W52/10 (EP,US);
H04W52/08 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/241 (EP,US);
H04W52/242 (EP,US);
H04W52/243 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | H04W52/12, H04W52/14, H04W52/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2011/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Aufwärtsstreckenübertragungsleistung in einem Kommunikationssystem | [2011/20] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling uplink transmission power in a communication system | [2011/20] | French: | Appareil et procédé de commande de la puissance de transmission en liaison montante et système de communication | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2010 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | NL | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | IE | 12.11.2020 | LU | 12.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 12.11.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 12.11.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 12.11.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 12.11.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 12.11.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 12.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1855391 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,5,8-10* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0030] *; | [XYI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090901), no. V8.8.0, pages 1 - 81, XP050377563 [X] 1,2,6,11,12 * Chapter 5.1 "Uplink Power Control"; page 9 - page 15 * [Y] 4,5,8-10 [I] 3,7 |