EP2322836 - Method to carry out a branching point of a pipe line under repair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consti Talotekniikka OY Urakoitsijantie 15 A 1 06450 Porvoo / FI | [2012/29] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states PutkiReformi Oy Urakoitsijantie 15 A1 06450 Porvoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weckström, Jan / c/o Urakoitsijantie 15 A 1 06450 Porvoo / FI | [2012/34] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Weckström, Jan c/o Urakoitsijantie 15 A 1 06450 Porvoo / FI | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2012/34] |
Former [2011/20] | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10191533.8 | 17.11.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | FI20090006193 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: FI 20096193 | [2011/20] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322836 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322836 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/164, F16L55/165, F16L55/179 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
F16L55/164 (EP);
F16L55/1645 (FI);
F16L55/165 (EP,FI);
F16L55/179 (EP,FI)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Abzweigstelle eines zu sanierenden Rohres | [2011/20] | English: | Method to carry out a branching point of a pipe line under repair | [2011/20] | French: | Méthode d'éxecution d'un point de bifurcation d'une conduite en réparation | [2012/20] |
Former [2011/20] | Methode d'execution d'un point de bifurcation d'une conduite en réparation | Examination procedure | 27.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2010 | AL | 22.08.2012 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MK | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | RS | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | SM | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | IE | 17.11.2012 | LU | 17.11.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 17.11.2010 | |
AL | 22.08.2012 | ||
AT | 22.08.2012 | ||
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
LU | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 22.08.2012 | |
AT | 22.08.2012 | ||
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
LU | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 22.08.2012 | |
AT | 22.08.2012 | ||
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AL | 22.08.2012 | |
AT | 22.08.2012 | ||
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 22.08.2012 | |
AT | 22.08.2012 | ||
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
RS | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0740102 (KUBEL JOHANN [AT]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 20 * * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 25 * * claims 1,2 * * figure . * [I] 2-4; | [A]EP0856697 (SHONAN GOSEI JUSHI SEISAKUSHO [JP], et al) [A] 2,3 * figures 4-7; claim - *; | [AD]DE4115563 (LINCK HANS PETER [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0188338 (SORD TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,3,4 * * page 2, line 15 - line 28 * * page 21, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | JP2002340272 | DE4115563 |