EP2325958 - Surge current detection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankosha Corporation 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okawa, Takayuki c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Yasuharu c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Saeki, Hideyoshi c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ouchi, Takuya c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
Okawa, Takayuki c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Yamada, Yasuharu c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Saeki, Hideyoshi c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Ouchi, Takuya c/o SANKOSHA CORPORATION 3-8, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10191817.5 | 19.11.2010 | [2011/21] | Priority number, date | JP20090266330 | 24.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009266330 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2325958 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2325958 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01T1/12, G01R15/14, G02B26/02, G01R15/20 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
H01T1/12 (EP,US);
G01R15/148 (EP,US);
G01R33/1269 (EP,US);
G02B26/026 (EP,US);
G01R15/207 (EP,US);
G01R19/04 (EP,US);
G01R33/0213 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | Spitzenstromerkennungsgerät | [2011/21] | English: | Surge current detection device | [2011/21] | French: | Dispositif de détection de courant de choc | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 21.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2010 | AL | 26.11.2014 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | RS | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MK | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/45] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR970979 (OERLIKON MASCHF) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5697879 (KATO GIICHIROU) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH0516578 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4706016 (SCHWEITZER JR EDMUND O [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5373242 (JOULIE RENE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2005150657 | JP2006244889 | JP2007242569 | JPH0516578 | JPH076801 |