Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
08.02.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
18.01.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.12.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.05.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |